This case was last updated from PACER on 08/25/2020 at 08:09:48 (UTC).

Gollnick v. Saul

Case Summary

On 06/26/2020 Gollnick filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard E. Myers, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00274

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard E. Myers, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrea Gollnick

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charlotte Williams Hall

Attorney at Arrowood & Hall, PLLC

P.O. Box 58129

Raleigh, NC 27658

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the complaint and issue the summonses prepared by Plaintiff. The United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve the summonses and a copy of the complaint on Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 6/26/2020. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Affidavit of Service for US Marshals 285 Form - Summons and Complaint served on Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security on 7/13/2020. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Affidavit of Service for US Marshals 285 Form - Summons and Complaint served on U.S. Attorney General on 7/8/2020. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Affidavit of Service for US Marshals 285 Form - Summons and Complaint served on U.S. Attorney on 7/16/2020. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRemark - Copy of #4 order and copies of USM 285 forms, complaint, summonses, notice of appearance forms and financial disclosures sent to US Marshal for service on 6/26/2020. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, US Attorney, and US Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 US Marshal 285 Forms) (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Andrea Gollnick. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the complaint and issue the summonses prepared by Plaintiff. The United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve the summonses and a copy of the complaint on Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 6/26/2020. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to United States Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Andrea Gollnick (Hall, Charlotte) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Charlotte Williams Hall on behalf of Andrea Gollnick. (Hall, Charlotte) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Andrea Gollnick. (Attachments: #1 US Marshal Form, #2 Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hall, Charlotte) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less