This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2022 at 21:17:19 (UTC).

Goldstein et al v. Professional Staff Congress/CUNY et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 Goldstein filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Professional Staff Congress/CUNY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul A. Engelmayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00321

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Engelmayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Avraham Goldstein

Michael Goldstein

Frimette Kass-Shraibman

Mitchell Langbert

Jeffrey Lax

Maria Pagano

Defendants

Professional Staff Congress/CUNY

City University of New York

John Wirenius

Rosemary A. Townley

Anthony Zumbolo

City of New York

Thomas P. DiNapoli

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Danielle Susanj

Attorney at The Fairness Center

500 North Third Street, Suite 600B

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Milton L Chappell

Attorney at National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.

8001 Braddock Rd., Ste 600

Springfield, VA 22151

William Messenger

Attorney at National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.

8001 Braddock Rd., Ste 600

Springfield, VA 22151

Nathan J. McGrath

Attorney at The Fairness Center

500 North Third Street, Suite 600B

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Defendant Attorneys

Hanan B. Kolko

Attorney at Cohen Weiss and Simon LLP

900 Third Avenue, Ste 2100

New York, NY 10022

Kate Montgomery Swearengen

Attorney at Cohen, Weiss and Simon LLP

900 Third Avenue, Suite 2100

New York, NY 10022-4869

Peter Zwiebach

Attorney at Professional Staff Congress

61 Broadway, Suite 1500

New York, NY 11105

Scott A. Kronland

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Jonathan Adam Siegel

Attorney at Office of the New York State Attorney General

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

John Francis Walpole

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street, Ste 2-187

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#68

(#68) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #56 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. . Document filed by Professional Staff Congress/CUNY..(Kolko, Hanan) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

67 #2

Exhibit Acceptance of Rule 68 Offer of Judgment

67 #1

Exhibit Affirmation of Service

67 #67

Main Document

#66

(#66) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #53 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by State Defendants. . Document filed by City University of New York, Thomas P. DiNapoli, Rosemary A. Townley, John Wirenius, Anthony Zumbolo..(Siegel, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#65

(#65) LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Counsel for Plaintiffs dated 5/24/2022 re: Request for Oral Argument. Document filed by Avraham Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Frimette Kass-Shraibman, Mitchell Langbert, Jeffrey Lax, Maria Pagano..(McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#59

(#60) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #59 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Defendant City of New York. . Document filed by City of New York..(Walpole, John) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#56

(#64) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #56 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint., #53 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by State Defendants., #59 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Defendant City of New York. . Document filed by Avraham Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Frimette Kass-Shraibman, Mitchell Langbert, Jeffrey Lax, Maria Pagano..(McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#53

(#64) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #56 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint., #53 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by State Defendants., #59 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Defendant City of New York. . Document filed by Avraham Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Frimette Kass-Shraibman, Mitchell Langbert, Jeffrey Lax, Maria Pagano..(McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rosemary A. Townley, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Avraham Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Frimette Kass-Shraibman, Mitchell Langbert, Jeffrey Lax, Maria Pagano..(McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Wirenius, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Avraham Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Frimette Kass-Shraibman, Mitchell Langbert, Jeffrey Lax, Maria Pagano..(McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City University of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Avraham Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Frimette Kass-Shraibman, Mitchell Langbert, Jeffrey Lax, Maria Pagano..(McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Professional Staff Congress/CUNY, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Avraham Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Frimette Kass-Shraibman, Mitchell Langbert, Jeffrey Lax, Maria Pagano..(McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #56 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. . Document filed by Professional Staff Congress/CUNY..(Kolko, Hanan) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) NOTICE of ACCEPTANCE OF RULE 68 OFFER OF JUDGMENT. Document filed by City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affirmation of Service, #2 Exhibit Acceptance of Rule 68 Offer of Judgment).(Walpole, John) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #53 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by State Defendants. . Document filed by City University of New York, Thomas P. DiNapoli, Rosemary A. Townley, John Wirenius, Anthony Zumbolo..(Siegel, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Counsel for Plaintiffs dated 5/24/2022 re: Request for Oral Argument. Document filed by Avraham Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Frimette Kass-Shraibman, Mitchell Langbert, Jeffrey Lax, Maria Pagano..(McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #56 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint., #53 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by State Defendants., #59 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Defendant City of New York. . Document filed by Avraham Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Frimette Kass-Shraibman, Mitchell Langbert, Jeffrey Lax, Maria Pagano..(McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/24/2022 (vfr) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING AND INCREASED PAGE LIMITATION PLAINTIFF's granting #62 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. AND NOW, this 11th day of May, 2022, upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidated Briefing and Increased Page Limitation, and for good cause shown, the motion is GRANTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file one Memorandum of Law in opposition to each Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, not to exceed thirty-five (35) pages in length, on or before May 24, 2022. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/11/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Consolidated Briefing addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Counsel for Plaintiffs dated May 11, 2022. Document filed by Avraham Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Frimette Kass-Shraibman, Mitchell Langbert, Jeffrey Lax, Maria Pagano. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion).(McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file any amended complaint by May 11, 2022. As directed in the Court's order of March 9, 2022, should plaintiffs amend their complaint, the parties will jointly propose a briefing schedule for defendants' motions to dismiss at that time. Dkt. 47. No further opportunities to amend will ordinarily be granted. If plaintiffs do amend, by June 1, 2022---or at another date jointly proposed and approved by the Court-defendants shall each: (1) file an answer; (2) file a new motion to dismiss; or (3) submit a letter to the Court, copying plaintiffs, stating that they rely on their previously filed motions to dismiss. It is further ORDERED that, per the briefing schedule, Dkt. 47, if no amended complaint is filed, plaintiffs shall serve any opposition to the motion to dismiss by May 24, 2022. Defendants' replies, if any, shall be served by June 14, 2022. At the time any reply is served, the moving party shall supply the Court with a courtesy copy of all motion papers by attaching them as PDF files to a single email addressed to EngelmayerNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts. gov. The Court will determine later, after receipt of plaintiffs' anticipated brief opposing a motion to dismiss the current or amended complaint, whether to schedule oral argument. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/11/2022.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/21/2022) (va) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #59 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Defendant City of New York. . Document filed by City of New York..(Walpole, John) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Nathan J. McGrath to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25579965. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Avraham Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Frimette Kass-Shraibman, Mitchell Langbert, Jeffrey Lax, Maria Pagano. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Good Standing Pennsylvania, #3 Proposed Order).(McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Thomas P. DiNapoli, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Avraham Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Frimette Kass-Shraibman, Mitchell Langbert, Jeffrey Lax, Maria Pagano..(McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Avraham Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Frimette Kass-Shraibman, Mitchell Langbert, Jeffrey Lax, Maria Pagano..(McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anthony Zumbolo, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Avraham Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Frimette Kass-Shraibman, Mitchell Langbert, Jeffrey Lax, Maria Pagano..(McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rosemary A. Townley, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Avraham Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Frimette Kass-Shraibman, Mitchell Langbert, Jeffrey Lax, Maria Pagano..(McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Wirenius, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Avraham Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Frimette Kass-Shraibman, Mitchell Langbert, Jeffrey Lax, Maria Pagano..(McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City University of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Avraham Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Frimette Kass-Shraibman, Mitchell Langbert, Jeffrey Lax, Maria Pagano..(McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Professional Staff Congress/CUNY, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Avraham Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Frimette Kass-Shraibman, Mitchell Langbert, Jeffrey Lax, Maria Pagano..(McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against City University of New York, City of New York, Thomas P. DiNapoli, Professional Staff Congress/CUNY, Rosemary A. Townley, John Wirenius, Anthony Zumbolo. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25579727)Document filed by Maria Pagano, Frimette Kass-Shraibman, Michael Goldstein, Avraham Goldstein, Mitchell Langbert, Jeffrey Lax. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City University of New York is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Adam Siegel(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kate M. Swearengen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott A. Kronland