Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/17/2019 at 07:11:59 (UTC).

GOLDSON v. CHASE BANK USA

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 GOLDSON filed an Other lawsuit against CHASE BANK USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are CHARLES A STAMPELOS and ROBERT L HINKLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00521

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

CHARLES A STAMPELOS

Presiding Judge

ROBERT L HINKLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAREEM GOLDSON

Defendants

CHASE BANK USA, N.A. n/k/a JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.

CHASE BANK USA NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER W BOSS

Attorney at BOSS LAW - ST PETERSBURG FL

9887 4Th Street North, Suite 202

St Petersburg, FL 33702

Defendant Attorneys

DARNESHA K CARTER

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS PA - TAMPA FL

4221 W Boy Scout Blvd, Suite 1000

Tampa, FL 33607-5780

ROBERT M QUINN

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS PA - TAMPA FL

Po Box 3239

Tampa, FL 33601-3239

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CHASE BANK USA NA identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for CHASE BANK USA NA.. (CARTER, DARNESHA) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#10

(#10) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/17/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/16/2020. Discovery due by 3/31/2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 12/3/19. (blb) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. The defendant's unopposed motion, ECF No. #7 , to extend the deadline to respond to the first amended complaint is granted. The defendant's answer, ECF No. #8 , is deemed timely. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 12/2/19. (blb) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#8

(#8) Defendant's Answer and Defenses ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by CHASE BANK USA NA. (CARTER, DARNESHA) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#7

(#7) UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by CHASE BANK USA NA. (CARTER, DARNESHA) Modified Title on 11/25/2019 (blb). (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by KAREEM GOLDSON. CHASE BANK USA NA served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (BOSS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to CHASE BANK USA NA. (rcb) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

4 #1

Proposed Summons

#4

(#4) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against CHASE BANK USA NA, filed by KAREEM GOLDSON. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (BOSS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BOSS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CHASE BANK USA, N.A. n/k/a JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4661447.), filed by KAREEM GOLDSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BOSS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CHASE BANK USA NA identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for CHASE BANK USA NA.. (CARTER, DARNESHA) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/17/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/16/2020. Discovery due by 3/31/2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 12/3/19. (blb) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. The defendant's unopposed motion, ECF No. #7 , to extend the deadline to respond to the first amended complaint is granted. The defendant's answer, ECF No. #8 , is deemed timely. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 12/2/19. (blb) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Defendant's Answer and Defenses ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by CHASE BANK USA NA. (CARTER, DARNESHA) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by CHASE BANK USA NA. (CARTER, DARNESHA) Modified Title on 11/25/2019 (blb). (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by KAREEM GOLDSON. CHASE BANK USA NA served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (BOSS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to CHASE BANK USA NA. (rcb) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against CHASE BANK USA NA, filed by KAREEM GOLDSON. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (BOSS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BOSS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Attorney CHRISTOPHER W BOSS Re #1 Complaint- Counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". Further, for future case openings: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide", (both available on the clerk's website). (blb) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CHASE BANK USA, N.A. n/k/a JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4661447.), filed by KAREEM GOLDSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BOSS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chase Bank USA NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert M. Quinn