This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/24/2020 at 08:45:05 (UTC).

Goldsmith et al v. Alterra Mountain Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Goldsmith filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Alterra Mountain Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Raymond P. Moore and S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02907

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raymond P. Moore

Referral Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Erin Goldsmith

Isabel C. Ossa

Defendants

Alterra Mountain Company

Arch Insurance Company

Ikon Pass, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Michael Unthank

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

Kathryn A. Reilly

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

Natalie Elizabeth West

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

Ryan William Cooke

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Transfer Letter from USDC - CDCA

1 #2

Docket Sheet

1 #3

Joint Stipulation to Sever Claims

#4

4 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

#6

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The Joint Motion to Consolidate is GRANTED; Civil Action Nos. 20-cv-02907-RM-SKC and 20-cv-01057-RM-SKC (as consolidated) shall be consolidated for all pretrial purposes under the above caption; all future filings in these consolidated actions shall be filed in the lowest case number only, No. 20-cv-01057-RM-SKC, and shall be captioned as set forth above; a copy of this Order of Consolidation shall also be filed in Civil Action No. 20-cv-02907-RM-SKC; and that the Goldsmith Action shall be subject to the Court's Order of July 31, 2020 (ECF No. 64). By Judge Raymond P. Moore on October 13, 2020. (rvill, ) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Hawk Holding Company, Inc. for Alterra Mountain Company. (Reilly, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Consolidate by Defendants Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc. (Reilly, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan William Cooke on behalf of Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc.Attorney Ryan William Cooke added to party Alterra Mountain Company(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan William Cooke added to party Ikon Pass, Inc.(pty:dft) (Cooke, Ryan) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Natalie Elizabeth West on behalf of Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc.Attorney Natalie Elizabeth West added to party Alterra Mountain Company(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Elizabeth West added to party Ikon Pass, Inc.(pty:dft) (West, Natalie) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Michael Unthank on behalf of Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc.Attorney Andrew Michael Unthank added to party Alterra Mountain Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Michael Unthank added to party Ikon Pass, Inc.(pty:dft) (Unthank, Andrew) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kathryn A. Reilly on behalf of Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc.Attorney Kathryn A. Reilly added to party Alterra Mountain Company(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn A. Reilly added to party Ikon Pass, Inc.(pty:dft) (Reilly, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/25/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/25/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Alterra Mountain Company, Arch Insurance Company, Ikon Pass, Inc., filed by Erin Goldsmith, and Isabel C. Ossa.(agarc, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against Alterra Mountain Company, Arch Insurance Company, Ikon Pass, Inc., filed by Erin Goldsmith, and Isabel C. Ossa.(agarc, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF REMOVAL, filed by Arch Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(agarc, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (agarc, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case transferred in from United States District Court for the Central District of California; Case Number 2:20-cv-05722-JAK-ADS. Transfer order and docket sheet received, filed by Erin Goldsmith, and Isabel C. Ossa. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Letter from USDC - CDCA, #2 Docket Sheet)(agarc, ) #3 Joint Stipulation to Sever Claims Additional attachment added on 9/25/2020 (agarc, ). Modified on 10/8/2020 to correct docket text (agarc, ). (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Ikon Pass, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Alterra Mountain Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Natalie Elizabeth West