This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/30/2020 at 11:46:23 (UTC).

Goldmass, LLC v. AmGUARD Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 Goldmass, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AmGUARD Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Walter and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00931

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Goldmass, LLC

Defendants

AmGUARD Insurance Company

Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Companies

National Indemnity Company

Berkshire Hathaway Inc.

Franklin Insurance Adjusters, Inc.

DOES 1 to 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Katherine A Bruce

Attorney at Kabateck LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Joana Fang

Attorney at Kabateck LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Christopher B Noyes

Attorney at Kabateck LLP

633 West Fifth Street Suite 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Brian S Kabateck

Attorney at Kabateck LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorneys

Leo L Ashley, III

Attorney at Weston and McElvain LLP

1960 East Grand Avenue Suite 400

El Segundo, CA 90245

Richard C Weston

Attorney at Weston and McElvain LLP

1960 East Grand Ave, Suite 400

El Segundo, CA 90245

 

Court Documents

25 #1

Proposed Order

#25

(#25) *stricken* NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Trial Date on October 13, 2020 Or Assignment to a Magistrate Judge in the Alternative filed by Plaintiff Goldmass, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fang, Joana) Modified on 3/25/2020 (sr). (Entered: 03/24/2020)

24 #2

Proposed Order Granting Motion

24 #1

Exhibit 1 ISO Motion

#24

(#24) *Stricken* NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Goldmass, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 ISO Motion, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Fang, Joana) Modified on 3/25/2020 (sr). (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#23

(#23) Initial DISCLOSURE of Rule 26 (a)(1) filed by Plaintiff Goldmass, LLC (Fang, Joana) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#22

(#22) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 6 with JURY DEMAND [Answer to First Amended Complaint (First Amended Complaint appears as document 1-15)] filed by Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company.(Weston, Richard) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#21

(#21) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Goldmass, LLC pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) For Complaint as to Berkshire Hathaway Inc., National Indemnity Company. (Fang, Joana) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#20

(#20) CORRECTED ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter, re Order #18 . The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: December 14, 2020. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: December 18, 2020. (smo) Modified on 3/5/2020 (smo). (Entered: 03/05/2020)

1 #36

National Indemnity's Motion to Strike

1 #35

Reply to Demurrer

1 #32

Request for Judicial Notice

1 #16

Proof of Service Re FAC - Franklin Insurance Adjusters

1 #15

First Amended Complaint

1 #14

Proof of Service Re Notice of Errata

1 #10

Proof of Service - National Indemnity

1 #9

Proof of Service - Berkshire Hathaway

1 #8

Proof of Service - Berkshire Hathaway Guard

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Text Entry Only: Plaintiffs Motion for Trial Preference and/or Assignment to a Magistrate Judge in the Alternative, filed on March 24, 2020 (Docket No. #25 ), is STRICKEN for failure to comply with paragraph 5(b) of the Court's Standing Order.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Text Entry Only: Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File SecondAmended Complaint, filed on March 24, 2020 (Docket No. #24 ), is STRICKEN for failure to comply with paragraph 5(b) of the Court's Standing Order.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) *stricken* NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Trial Date on October 13, 2020 Or Assignment to a Magistrate Judge in the Alternative filed by Plaintiff Goldmass, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fang, Joana) Modified on 3/25/2020 (sr). (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) *Stricken* NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Goldmass, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 ISO Motion, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Fang, Joana) Modified on 3/25/2020 (sr). (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Initial DISCLOSURE of Rule 26 (a)(1) filed by Plaintiff Goldmass, LLC (Fang, Joana) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 6 with JURY DEMAND [Answer to First Amended Complaint (First Amended Complaint appears as document 1-15)] filed by Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company.(Weston, Richard) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Goldmass, LLC pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) For Complaint as to Berkshire Hathaway Inc., National Indemnity Company. (Fang, Joana) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CORRECTED ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter, re Order #18 . The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: December 14, 2020. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: December 18, 2020. (smo) Modified on 3/5/2020 (smo). (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2021 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 3/26/2021, 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 4/6/2021 at 8:30 AM. (et) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on March 9, 2020 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: July 6, 2020. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: July 10, 2020. (iv) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for March 9, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before February 18, 2020. (iv) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • Docket(#6) CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Goldmass, LLC. in Los Angelse Superior Court on 8/21/2019, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants AmGUARD Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway Inc., National Indemnity Company, identifying Bu Soon Park (Plaintiff's lone member); National Indemnity Company (parent company of AmGUARD Insurance Company); Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. (parent company of AmGUARD Insurance Company and National Indemnity Company). (Ashley, Leo) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants AmGUARD Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway Inc., National Indemnity Company. (Ashley, Leo) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Notice of Removal of Action filed by Defendants AmGUARD Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway Inc., National Indemnity Company. (Ashley, Leo) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants AmGUARD Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway Inc., National Indemnity Company. (Ashley, Leo) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19SMCV01484 Receipt No: 0973-25219896 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants National Indemnity Company, AmGUARD Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Case Cover Sheet & Addendum, #4 Notice of Assignment, #5 ADR Information Packet, #6 Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulations Packet, #7 Proof of Service - AmGUARD, #8 Proof of Service - Berkshire Hathaway Guard, #9 Proof of Service - Berkshire Hathaway, #10 Proof of Service - National Indemnity, #11 Proof of Service - Franklin Insurance Adjusters, #12 Proof of Service - Berkshire Hathaway, #13 Notice of Errata Re Exhibits, #14 Proof of Service Re Notice of Errata, #15 First Amended Complaint, #16 Proof of Service Re FAC - Franklin Insurance Adjusters, #17 Request for Dismissal Re Franklin Insurance Adjusters, #18 Entered Request for Dismissal Re Franklin Insurance Adjusters, #19 Plaintiff's Case Management Statement, #20 AmGUARD's Case Management Statement, #21 Notice of Case Management Conference, #22 Notice of Posting Jury Fees, #23 Notice Re Continuance of Hearing, #24 Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference and Pending Motions, #25 Berkshire Hathaway's Motion to Quash, #26 Declaration of Daniel Jaksich, #27 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Quash, #28 Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Quash, #29 Reply to Motion to Quash, #30 National Indemnity's Demurrer, #31 Declaration of Leo L. Ashley III, #32 Request for Judicial Notice, #33 Proposed Order Sustaining Demurrer, #34 Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer, #35 Reply to Demurrer, #36 National Indemnity's Motion to Strike, #37 Declaration of Leo L. Ashley III, #38 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Strike, #39 Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Strike, #40 Reply to Motion to Strike, #41 AmGUARD's Motion to Strike, #42 Declaration of Leo L. Ashley III, #43 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Strike, #44 Berkshire Hathaway's Motion for Sanctions, #45 Declaration of Leo L. Ashley III, #46 Request for Judicial Notice, #47 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Sanctions, #48 Proof of Service Re Motion for Sanctions, #49 National Indemnity's Motion for Sanctions, #50 Declaration of Leo L. Ashley III, #51 Request for Judicial Notice, #52 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Sanctions, #53 Proof of Service Re Motion for Sanctions) (Attorney Leo L Ashley, III added to party AmGUARD Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Leo L Ashley, III added to party Berkshire Hathaway Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Leo L Ashley, III added to party National Indemnity Company(pty:dft))(Ashley, Leo) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases where AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Berkshire Hathaway Automotive (Van AutoPlex) is a litigant