This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:20:01 (UTC).

Goldman v. Cox Radio, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Goldman filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Cox Radio, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jesse M. Furman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11146

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesse M. Furman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Justin Goldman

Defendants

www.Easy93.com

Cox Radio, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kenneth P. Norwick

Attorney at Norwick & Schad

110 East 59Th Street, 29Th Flr

New York, NY 10022

Stephanie Vazquez

Attorney at Allen, Dyer, Doppelt , Gilchrist, PA

1221 Brickell Ave, Suite 2400

Miami, FL 33131

Robert Houpt Thornburg

Attorney at Allen, Dyer, Doppelt Gilchrist P.A.

1221 Brickell Avenue, Suite 2400

Miami, FL 33131

Joshua B. Spector

Attorney at Perlman, Bajandas, Yevoli & Albright, P.L.

1000 Brickell Avenue, Suite 600

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorney

Rachel Elise Fugate

Attorney at Shullman Fugate PLLC

Suite 4006, 2101 Vista Parkway

West Palm Beach, FL 33411

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER. For the reasons stated on the record during the conference held on November 6, 2019, the above-captioned cases are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all purposes pursuant to Rule 42 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate these cases under the lead case, Docket No. 19-CV-2954, and to close 19-CV-11146 for administrative purposes. All future filings shall be on the 19-CV-2954 docket only. As discussed on the record, Defendants may file a single, consolidated answer to all of Plaintiff's complaints. All deadlines otherwise in force in 19-CV-2954 shall likewise apply to the cases to be consolidated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/5/19) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02954-JMF, 1:19-cv-11146-UA(yv) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Cox Radio, Inc., www.Easy93.com. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#13

(#13) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Florida Southern; Case Number: 1:19-cv-21947. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summon(s)

#5

(#5) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Kenneth P. Norwick, mailing date May 15, 2019, (pt) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#8

(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER administratively closing case in light of the #8 Joint Motion to Stay. Either party may move to reopen at any time. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/19/2019. (jdo) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE/STIPULATION of Substitution of Counsel by Joshua B. Spector on behalf of Justin Goldman instead of prior counsel of record Robert Thornburg. . Attorney Joshua B. Spector added to party Justin Goldman(pty:pla). (Spector, Joshua) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#12

No Description Available

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel Elise Fugate on behalf of Cox Radio, Inc., www.Easy93.com. Attorney Rachel Elise Fugate added to party Cox Radio, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Elise Fugate added to party www.Easy93.com(pty:dft). (Fugate, Rachel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 08/16/2019)

13 #1

*Restricted*

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against Cox Radio, Inc., www.Easy93.com. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11643931, filed by Justin Goldman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Thornburg, Robert) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#4

(#4) FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (mailed) (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 05/15/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-02954-JMF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 12/5/19 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (yv) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER. For the reasons stated on the record during the conference held on November 6, 2019, the above-captioned cases are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all purposes pursuant to Rule 42 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate these cases under the lead case, Docket No. 19-CV-2954, and to close 19-CV-11146 for administrative purposes. All future filings shall be on the 19-CV-2954 docket only. As discussed on the record, Defendants may file a single, consolidated answer to all of Plaintiff's complaints. All deadlines otherwise in force in 19-CV-2954 shall likewise apply to the cases to be consolidated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/5/19) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02954-JMF, 1:19-cv-11146-UA(yv) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:19-cv-02954-JMF. (yv) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Jesse M. Furman as possibly related to 1:19-cv-2954. (sjo) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sjo) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Florida Southern; Case Number: 1:19-cv-21947. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE/STIPULATION of Substitution of Counsel by Joshua B. Spector on behalf of Justin Goldman instead of prior counsel of record Robert Thornburg. . Attorney Joshua B. Spector added to party Justin Goldman(pty:pla). (Spector, Joshua) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PAPERLESS ORDER administratively closing case in light of the #8 Joint Motion to Stay. Either party may move to reopen at any time. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/19/2019. (jdo) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint MOTION to Stay and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Cox Radio, Inc., www.Easy93.com. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fugate, Rachel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel Elise Fugate on behalf of Cox Radio, Inc., www.Easy93.com. Attorney Rachel Elise Fugate added to party Cox Radio, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Elise Fugate added to party www.Easy93.com(pty:dft). (Fugate, Rachel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Kenneth P. Norwick, mailing date May 15, 2019, (pt) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (mailed) (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Cox Radio, Inc., www.Easy93.com. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against Cox Radio, Inc., www.Easy93.com. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11643931, filed by Justin Goldman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Thornburg, Robert) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.