This case was last updated from PACER on 12/21/2019 at 07:16:54 (UTC).

Goldman V. COX MEDIA GROUP NORTHEAST, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/22/2019 Goldman filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against COX MEDIA GROUP NORTHEAST, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is F. Dennis Saylor, IV. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-12180

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

F. Dennis Saylor, IV

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Justin Goldman

Defendant

COX MEDIA GROUP NORTHEAST, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth P. Norwick

Attorney at Norwick Schad & Goering

110 East 59Th Street

New York, NY 10022

Defendant Attorney

David K. Caplan

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton

9720 Wishire Boulevard

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet & Category Form

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against COX MEDIA GROUP NORTHEAST, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7935389 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Justin Goldman.(Norwick, Kenneth) #1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Form) Modified on 10/22/2019 to separate attachments into proper docket text (Kelly, Danielle). (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by David K. Caplan on behalf of COX MEDIA GROUP NORTHEAST, LLC (Caplan, David) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#2

(#2) REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Norwick, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Consent MOTION to Change Venue by COX MEDIA GROUP NORTHEAST, LLC. (Halley, Taylor) (Halley, Taylor). (Entered: 11/29/2019)

#6

(#6) Consent MOTION to Change Venue by COX MEDIA GROUP NORTHEAST, LLC.(Caplan, David) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to COX MEDIA GROUP NORTHEAST, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • (#9) Electronic notice to counsel: This civil action has been transferred to the Southern District of New York and assigned civil case number 1:19-cv-11060. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • (#8) Case transferred to Southern District of New York;. Original file with documents numbered all documents, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to Clerk in that district. (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Consent MOTION to Change Venue by COX MEDIA GROUP NORTHEAST, LLC. (Halley, Taylor) (Halley, Taylor). (Entered: 11/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Consent MOTION to Change Venue by COX MEDIA GROUP NORTHEAST, LLC.(Caplan, David) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by David K. Caplan on behalf of COX MEDIA GROUP NORTHEAST, LLC (Caplan, David) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to COX MEDIA GROUP NORTHEAST, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Norwick, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against COX MEDIA GROUP NORTHEAST, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7935389 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Justin Goldman.(Norwick, Kenneth) #1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Form) Modified on 10/22/2019 to separate attachments into proper docket text (Kelly, Danielle). (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.