This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/15/2020 at 12:13:17 (UTC).

Goldin et al v. Restrepo et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2020 Goldin filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Restrepo. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mary S. McElroy and Lincoln D. Almond. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00262

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary S. McElroy

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jonathon Acosta

Jeanine Calkin

Defendants

Janice Pucci

Diane C. Mederos

Edward Murphy

Richard H. Pierce

Mercedes Bernal

Maria M. Pavao

Claudia J. Haugen

Juan Pablo Restrepo

Dorothy McCarthy

Stephen P. Erickson

Nellie Gorbea

Denise A. Vasques

Alberto Deburgos

Emmanuel L. Lyte

Edward Cantone, Jr.

David H. Sholes

Kenneth McGill

Isadore S. Ramos

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Armando E. Batastini

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

One Citizens Plaza, Suite 500

Providence, RI 02903

Defendant Attorneys

Michael B. Forte

Attorney at Olenn & Penza

530 Greenwich Avenue

Warwick, RI 02886

Santiago H. Posas

Attorney at Oliverio & Marcaccio, LLP

55 Dorrance Street, Suite 400

Providence, RI 02903

Raymond A. Marcaccio

Attorney at Oliverio & Marcaccio, LLP

55 Dorrance Street, Suite 400, 861-2900, Fax: 861-2922

Providence, RI 02903

Timothy M. Bliss

Attorney at Center Place

50 Park Row West, Suite 101

Providence, RI 02903

Kevin F. McHugh

996 Smith Street

Providence, RI 02908

Matthew T. Jerzyk

Attorney at The Law Offices of Matthew Jerzyk LLC

260 West Exchange St. Suite 102A

Providence, RI 02903

Angel Taveras

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

One International Place

Boston, MA 02110

Other Attorneys

Frank J. Milos, Jr.

Attorney at Neary & Milos

103 Cottage Street

Pawtucket, RI 02860

Michael W. Field

Attorney at Department of Attorney General

150 South Main Street - Civil Division, 274-4400, Ext. 2380, Fax: 222-2995

Providence, RI 02903

Miriam Weizenbaum

Attorney at Office of RI Attorney General

150 South Main Street

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

#43

#40

#39

#38

#36

#35

#34

#33

#32

#4

#3

2 #1

Supporting Memorandum

#2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Affidavit

1 #2

Affidavit

1 #1

Exhibit A, Letter

#1

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ANSWER to Complaint by Juan Pablo Restrepo, Alberto Deburgos, Bryant A. Estrada, Emmanuel L. Lyte.(Jerzyk, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT entering ORDER re #34 Stipulation filed by Emmanuel L. Lyte, Bryant A. Estrada, Juan Pablo Restrepo, Alberto Deburgos, #35 Stipulation filed by David H. Sholes, Diane C. Mederos, William E. West, Isadore S. Ramos, Stephen P. Erickson, Jennifer L. Johnson, Richard H. Pierce, #36 Stipulation filed by Nellie Gorbea, #33 Stipulation filed by Nicholas Bianco, Gary E. Wynkoop, Janice Pucci, Denise A. Vasques, #38 Stipulation filed by Jennifer Rourke, Lenny Cioe, Tiara Mack, Jeanine Calkin, Gayle Goldin, Jonathon Acosta, #32 Stipulation filed by Peter Neronha, #40 Stipulation filed by Claudia J. Haugen, Mercedes Bernal, Renay Brooks Omisore, Kathy Placencia, #37 Stipulation filed by Dorothy McCarthy, Donna J. McDonald, Susan Abramson, Edward Murphy, #39 Stipulation filed by City of Pawtucket, Juan Pablo Restrepo answer due 8/17/2020; Susan Abramson answer due 8/17/2020; Mercedes Bernal answer due 8/17/2020; Nicholas Bianco answer due 8/17/2020; Edward Cantone, Jr. answer due 8/17/2020; Robert W. Castle answer due 8/17/2020; City of Pawtucket answer due 8/17/2020; Alberto Deburgos answer due 8/17/2020; Stephen P. Erickson answer due 8/17/2020; Bryant A. Estrada answer due 8/17/2020; Nellie Gorbea answer due 8/17/2020; Claudia J. Haugen answer due 8/17/2020; Jennifer L. Johnson answer due 8/17/2020; Emmanuel L. Lyte answer due 8/17/2020; Dorothy McCarthy answer due 8/17/2020; Donna J. McDonald answer due 8/17/2020; Kenneth McGill answer due 8/17/2020; Diane C. Mederos answer due 8/17/2020; Edward Murphy answer due 8/17/2020; Peter Neronha answer due 8/17/2020; Renay Brooks Omisore answer due 8/17/2020; Maria M. Pavao answer due 8/17/2020; Richard H. Pierce answer due 8/17/2020; Kathy Placencia answer due 8/17/2020; Janice Pucci answer due 8/17/2020; Isadore S. Ramos answer due 8/17/2020; David H. Sholes answer due 8/17/2020; Denise A. Vasques answer due 8/17/2020; William E. West answer due 8/17/2020; Gary E. Wynkoop answer due 8/17/2020 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 7/28/2020. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 7/28/2020. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ANSWER to Complaint by Mercedes Bernal, Claudia J. Haugen, Renay Brooks Omisore, Kathy Placencia.(McHugh, Kevin) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MOTION for an Extension of Time (To Extend Time by 45 days to File Their Petition for Fees) filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/6/2020. (Batastini, Armando) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Mercedes Bernal, Claudia J. Haugen, Renay Brooks Omisore, Kathy Placencia. (McHugh, Kevin) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) STIPULATION filed by City of Pawtucket. (Milos, Frank) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Batastini, Armando) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) STIPULATION regarding additional time to respond to complaint filed by Susan Abramson, Dorothy McCarthy, Donna J. McDonald, Edward Murphy. (Bliss, Timothy) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Nellie Gorbea. (Taveras, Angel) (Main Document 36 replaced on 7/1/2020) (Urizandi, Nisshy). (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Regarding acceptance of service by P. Nerohna as Attorney General of RI filed by All Plaintiffs. (Batastini, Armando) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Regarding Acceptance of Service by Defendants C. Haugen, R. Omisore, M. Bernal as members of Providence Bd of Canvassers and K. Placencia as Admin of Elections for City Providence filed by All Plaintiffs. (Batastini, Armando) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Emergency MOTION (Injunctive Relief and Request for Expedited Hearing) re: #1 Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/30/2020. (Batastini, Armando) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2020: #1 Supporting Memorandum) (Farrell Pletcher, Paula). (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/16/2020) (Farrell Pletcher, Paula). (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1518016 ), filed by Jonathon Acosta, Gayle Goldin, Jennifer Rourke, Jeanine Calkin, Lenny Cioe, Tiara Mack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Letter, #2 Affidavit Affidavit, #3 Affidavit Affidavit)(Batastini, Armando) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/16/2020) (Farrell Pletcher, Paula). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2020: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Farrell Pletcher, Paula). (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Emergency MOTION (Injunctive Relief and Request for Expedited Hearing) re: #1 Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/30/2020. (Batastini, Armando) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2020: #1 Supporting Memorandum) (Farrell Pletcher, Paula). (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/16/2020) (Farrell Pletcher, Paula). (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1518016 ), filed by Jonathon Acosta, Gayle Goldin, Jennifer Rourke, Jeanine Calkin, Lenny Cioe, Tiara Mack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Letter, #2 Affidavit Affidavit, #3 Affidavit Affidavit)(Batastini, Armando) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/16/2020) (Farrell Pletcher, Paula). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2020: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Farrell Pletcher, Paula). (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael W. Field