This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2021 at 20:48:07 (UTC).

Golden v. Apple Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 Golden filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Apple Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Bruce Howe Hendricks, Kevin McDonald and Joseph Dawson, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-04353

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kevin McDonald

Presiding Judges

Bruce Howe Hendricks

Joseph Dawson, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Larry Golden

Greenville, SC 29607

Defendants

General Motors Company

Verizon Corporation Service Group

Motorola Solutions Inc

LG Electronics, USA, Inc

Apple Inc.

Fairway Ford Lincoln of Greenville

Ford Global Technologies LLC

AT&T Inc

T-Mobile USA, Inc.

Big O Dodge Chrysler Jeep Ram

Qualcomm Inc

Panasonic Corporation

FCA US LLC

Sprint Corporation

Samsung Electronics USA

Kevin Whitaker Chevrolet

 

Court Documents

23 #5

Exhibit E-Government Contract For Smartphones

23 #4

Exhibit D-Claim Chart

23 #3

Exhibit C-Numbered Claim Chart Drawings of Apple iPhone 8

23 #2

Exhibit B-Patent Drawings (Evidence) Numbered Patent Drawings

#23

#20

#18

16 #1

Envelope

#16

10 #7

Envelope

10 #6

Exhibit F Patent7,385,497

10 #5

Exhibit E Patent RE43,891

10 #4

Exhibit D Patent RE43,990

10 #3

Exhibit C Patent 9,096,189

10 #2

Exhibit B Patent 9,589,439

10 #1

Exhibit A Patent 10,163,287

#10

#4

RESTRICTED

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) OBJECTION to #20 Report and Recommendation by Larry Golden. Reply to Objections due by 2/25/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Pictures of Evidence, LG V30, LG G6, Samsung S8, Apple iPhone 7, Apple iPhone 8, #2 Exhibit B- Patent Drawings (Evidence) Numbered Patent Drawings From Patent No. 10,163,287, #3 Exhibit C- (Previously Presented Evidence) Numbered Claim Chart Drawings of Apple iPhone 8, #4 Exhibit D- (Previously Presented Evidence) Claim Chart, #5 Exhibit E- (Claim Chart Previously Submitted) Government Contract For Smartphones, #6 Envelope)(rweb, ) Modified on 2/11/2021 to edit text (rweb, ). (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #18 Order, #20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #10 Amended Complaint, filed by Larry Golden, 19 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 21 Transfer of Case Management placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Larry Golden 740 Woodruff Road #1102 Greenville, SC 29607 (kric, ) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#21) ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Joseph Dawson III. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: US District Court, 300 East Washington Street, Greenville, SC 29601. (kric, ) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #10 Amended Complaint, filed by Larry Golden. The Court recommends that the District Court dismiss this action with prejudice and without issuance and service of process. It is further recommends that the assigned United States District Judge sanction the petitioner $400.00, payable to the Clerk of Court at 300 East Washington Street,Greenville, SC 29601. Objections to R&R due by 2/19/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 2/5/2021. (kric, ) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) TEXT ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as filing fee has been paid. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 2/5/2021.(kric, ) Modified on 2/5/2021 to edit text (kric, ). (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff (or petitioner) to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Because the plaintiff has paid the full filing fee, his motion to proceed in forma pauperis (doc. 4) is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 2/5/2021. (kric, ) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Letter from Larry Golden to Chief Judge Harwell regarding the relevancy of case. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket(#14) ***DOCUMENT MAILED 13 Notice Change of Case Number, 12 Case Reassigned placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Larry Golden 740 Woodruff Road #1102 Greenville, SC 29607 (kric, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER 6:20-cv-4353-JD-KFM has been changed to reflect the new District Judge's initials as this case has now been reassigned to the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III. (kric, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket(#12) Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Joseph Dawson, III. Judge Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks no longer assigned to the case. (glev, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Larry Golden. Service due by 4/5/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Patent 10,163,287, #2 Exhibit B Patent 9,589,439, #3 Exhibit C Patent 9,096,189, #4 Exhibit D Patent RE43,990, #5 Exhibit E Patent RE43,891, #6 Exhibit F Patent7,385,497, #7 Envelope)(kric, ) Modified on 1/5/2021 to edit text (kric, ). (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) OBJECTIONS by Larry Golden to #1 Proper Form Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rweb, ) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #1 Proper Form Order, to Brian Shropshire and Margaret Nason in Columbia Clerk's Office with instructions to mail the proper form order with all complaint documents and exhibit attachments to Mr Golden at 740 Woodruff Road #1102 Greenville, SC 29607. The proper form order was also mailed from Greenville with proper form documents. This mailing is only to return documents. The 26.01 interrogatories, the AO240 application and all service documents. Proposed summons and USM285 forms are to be taken out of the documents before mailing to Mr Golden and those documents sent via UPS to the Greenville Clerks Office as they have been filed in the case. (kric, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number SCX300091165 (kric, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #1 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Larry Golden 740 Woodruff Road #1102 Greenville, SC 29607 with blank complaint form (kric, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 1/7/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. A request for recusal is denied. Directing the clerk to return only the complaint and exhibits to the plaintiff. Clerk is to keep the IFP application, LR26.01 interrogatories and the proposed service documents for filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin F. McDonald on 12/17/2020. (kric, ) Modified on 12/17/2020 to edit signing judge. (kric, ). (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Larry Golden.(kric, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Larry Golden. Response to Motion due by 12/30/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Global Technologies LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Motorola Solutions Inc is a litigant