This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2019 at 07:47:32 (UTC).

Goldberg v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 Goldberg filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John H England, III and R David Proctor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01533

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John H England, III

R David Proctor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dan A Goldberg

Defendant

Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wendy L Williams

Attorney at GOLDBERG ATTORNEYS PC

505 North 20Th Street, 325 Financial Center

Birmingham, AL 35203

Samantha L Carnley

Attorney at CARNLEY LAW FIRM

1313 Alford Avenue

Hoover, AL 35226

Defendant Attorneys

Candace H Newton

Attorney at ELY & ISENBERG LLC

2100B Southbridge Parkway, Suite 380

Birmingham, AL 35209

Margaret C Philips

Attorney at ELY & ISENBERG, LLC

2100 B South Bridge, Ste. 380

Birmingham, AL 35209

Joel S Isenberg

Attorney at ELY & ISENBERG LLC

2100-B Southbridge Parkway, Suite 380

Birmingham, AL 35209

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/24/2019. (JLC) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#8

(#8) Notice of Reassignment The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. Please use case number 2:19 CV 1533 RDP on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#7

(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Newton, Candace) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/17/2019. (AFS) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 10/31/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 10/31/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:15 a.m. on 10/16/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/16/2019. (AFS) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#5

No Description Available

#4

(#4) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company The.(AFS) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company The (AFS) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit A part 2

1 #1

Exhibit A part 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company The from Circuit Court of Shelby County, Alabama, case number 58-cv-2019-900893.00., filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A part 1, #2 Exhibit A part 2)(AFS) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/24/2019. (JLC) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Reassignment The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. Please use case number 2:19 CV 1533 RDP on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John H England, III: Telephone Conference held on 10/16/2019; Attorneys S. Carnley and W. Williams present by phone for pltf; Attorney C. Newton present by phone for dft; consent process discussed; conf adj. (AVC) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Newton, Candace) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3435748. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company The from Circuit Court of Shelby County, Alabama, case number 58-cv-2019-900893.00., filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1, # 2 Exhibit A part 2)(AFS). (Newton, Candace) NDAL rec# B4601100667 Modified on 9/17/2019 (KAM). (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/17/2019. (AFS) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 10/31/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 10/31/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:15 a.m. on 10/16/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/16/2019. (AFS) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company The.(AFS) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company The (AFS) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company The from Circuit Court of Shelby County, Alabama, case number 58-cv-2019-900893.00., filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A part 1, #2 Exhibit A part 2)(AFS) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.