This case was last updated from PACER on 11/08/2019 at 05:32:28 (UTC).

Gold Value International Textile, Inc. v. Edgemine, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 a Intellectual Property - Copyright case was filed by Gold Value International Textile, Inc against Edgemine, Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, California Central District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-09603

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gold Value International Textile, Inc.

Defendants

Asos.com Limited

Edgemine, Inc.

Eminent, Inc.

Dillard's, Inc.

Does 1 through 10,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott A Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (to replace document 17) filed by Defendant Dillard's, Inc..(Lee, Frank) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Dillard's, Inc..(Lee, Frank) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#13

(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile, Inc., upon Defendant Eminent, Inc. served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Telos Legal Corp., c/o Susan Boadway, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile, Inc., upon Defendant Edgemine, Inc. served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Keving Chang Kang, Authorized Agent for Service of Process c/o Xochitl C., Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Edgemine, Inc..(Lee, Frank) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile, Inc., upon Defendant Dillard's, Inc. served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Trust Company c/o Amy McLaren, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Asos.com Limited, Dillard's, Inc., Edgemine, Inc., Eminent, Inc. (esa) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#16

(#16) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Edgemine, Inc., identifying Edgemine, Inc., a California corporation. (Lee, Frank) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#11

(#11) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall.READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24749923 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile, Inc.. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Gold Value International Textile, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Gold Value International Textile, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#18

(#18) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Dillard's, Inc., identifying Dillards, Inc., a Delaware corporation. (Lee, Frank) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09603 CBM(AGRx). (rn) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Dillard's, Inc. answer now due 12/23/2019; Edgemine, Inc. answer now due 12/23/2019; Eminent, Inc. answer now due 12/23/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Dillard's, Inc.; Edgemine, Inc.; Eminent, Inc..(Attorney Frank N Lee added to party Dillard's, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Frank N Lee added to party Edgemine, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Frank N Lee added to party Eminent, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lee, Frank) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (to replace document 17) filed by Defendant Dillard's, Inc..(Lee, Frank) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Dillard's, Inc., identifying Dillards, Inc., a Delaware corporation. (Lee, Frank) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Dillard's, Inc..(Lee, Frank) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Edgemine, Inc., identifying Edgemine, Inc., a California corporation. (Lee, Frank) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Edgemine, Inc..(Lee, Frank) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Dillard's, Inc. answer now due 12/23/2019; Edgemine, Inc. answer now due 12/23/2019; Eminent, Inc. answer now due 12/23/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Dillard's, Inc.; Edgemine, Inc.; Eminent, Inc..(Attorney Frank N Lee added to party Dillard's, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Frank N Lee added to party Edgemine, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Frank N Lee added to party Eminent, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lee, Frank) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile, Inc., upon Defendant Eminent, Inc. served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Telos Legal Corp., c/o Susan Boadway, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile, Inc., upon Defendant Edgemine, Inc. served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Keving Chang Kang, Authorized Agent for Service of Process c/o Xochitl C., Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall.READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile, Inc., upon Defendant Dillard's, Inc. served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Trust Company c/o Amy McLaren, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09603 CBM(AGRx). (rn) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Asos.com Limited, Dillard's, Inc., Edgemine, Inc., Eminent, Inc. (esa) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Gold Value International Textile, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile, Inc., (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24749923 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile, Inc.. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Gold Value International Textile, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.