This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/06/2020 at 09:04:58 (UTC).

GOLD FISH, LLC v. ROWAN COUNTY SHERIFF KEVIN L. AUTEN

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 GOLD FISH, LLC filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ROWAN COUNTY SHERIFF KEVIN L AUTEN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are LORETTA C. BIGGS and L. PATRICK AULD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00119

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LORETTA C. BIGGS

Referral Judge

L. PATRICK AULD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLD FISH, LLC

Defendant

ROWAN COUNTY SHERIFF KEVIN L. AUTEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN W. TRAPP

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JAMES D. WILLIAMS, JR.

3200 Croasdaile Dr., Ste. 604

Durham, NC 27705

Defendant Attorneys

CHRISTOPHER J. GEIS

Attorney at WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP

One West Fourth Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27101

BRIAN F. CASTRO

Attorney at WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP

One West Fourth Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27101

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint, Summons, Motion for TRO

1 #2

Exhibit Notice of Removal for State Court

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Consent Form

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketMEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER ; Selection of Mediator due by 6/1/2020. Mediation due by 12/1/2020. (Gammon, Cheryl) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery shall be placed on a case-management track that is designated in Local Rule 26.1(a) asexceptional. Discovery due by 12/1/2020. Mediation should be near or after the close of the discovery period. The parties will select a mediator and file a notice of this selection with the Court no later than June 1, 2020. The parties will complete mediation at or near the close of discovery. Motions due by 1/10/2021. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2020. Defendant's Amended Pleadings due by 6/15/2020. Joinder of Parties for Plaintiff due by 5/15/2020. Joinder of Parties for Defendant due by 6/15/2020. The parties have discussed special procedures for managing this case, including reference of the case to a Magistrate Judge on consent of the parties under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The defendant agrees to file notice of said consent. The parties agree that pre-trial matters should be adjudicated by the Magistrate Judge assigned by the court. Trial in this case is expected to take no less than four days and will require a bench trial. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER adopting #9 Joint Rule 26(f) Report with the following clarification: notwithstanding the language of Paragraph 10, if this case proceeds to trial before a district judge, the Clerk will set the trial date in advance on any ruling on dispositive motions and the parties have no guarantee that the Court will rule in advance of trial, although the Court generally makes every effort to do so. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 04/01/2020. (AULD, L.) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Referred: RE: #9 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by ROWAN COUNTY SHERIFF KEVIN L. AUTEN.(GEIS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BRIAN F. CASTRO on behalf of Defendant ROWAN COUNTY SHERIFF KEVIN L. AUTEN (CASTRO, BRIAN) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 3/30/2020 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #3 Complaint by ROWAN COUNTY SHERIFF KEVIN L. AUTEN. (GEIS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to ROWAN COUNTY SHERIFF KEVIN L. AUTEN. (Original document filed in Rowan County Superior Court, Case Number 20-CVS-201, issued 1/28/2020 and listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against ROWAN COUNTY SHERIFF KEVIN L. AUTEN, filed by GOLD FISH, LLC. (Original document filed in Rowan County Superior Court, Case Number 20-CVS-201 and listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER J. GEIS on behalf of Defendant ROWAN COUNTY SHERIFF KEVIN L. AUTEN (GEIS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL against GOLD FISH, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2746304.), filed by ROWAN COUNTY SHERIFF KEVIN L. AUTEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, Summons, Motion for TRO, #2 Exhibit B Notice of Removal for State Court) (GEIS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROWAN COUNTY SHERIFF KEVIN L. AUTEN is a litigant