This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/27/2021 at 08:44:31 (UTC).

Goggin v. Blythe Construction Inc et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 Goggin filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Blythe Construction Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald C Coggins, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-03157

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald C Coggins, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Goggin

Defendants

Blythe Construction Inc

Zachry Construction Corp

Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc

Cowan Systems LLC

John Allen Ferguson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kenneth M Suggs

Gerald D Jowers, Jr

Defendant Attorneys

Kent T Stair

Christina Perrin

Tyler Paul Winton

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A-Agreement for the Design & Construction of Interstate 85 Reconstructio

1 #2

Exhibit B-Transportation Management Plan for SCDOT

1 #3

Exhibit C-Brian Bottomley's Affidavit of Merit

#3

#4

#5

(#5) MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/3/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Stair, Kent) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc.(Stair, Kent) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#8

(#8) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc.(Stair, Kent) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc.(Stair, Kent) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc.(Stair, Kent) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/3/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Stair, Kent) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (alew, ) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Thomas Goggin.(alew, ) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10097794.), filed by Thomas Goggin. Service due by 12/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Agreement for the Design & Construction of Interstate 85 Reconstruction, #2 Exhibit B-Transportation Management Plan for SCDOT, #3 Exhibit C-Brian Bottomley's Affidavit of Merit)(alew, ) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less