7:21-CV-03157
09/28/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Donald C Coggins, Jr
Thomas Goggin
Blythe Construction Inc
Zachry Construction Corp
Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc
Cowan Systems LLC
John Allen Ferguson
Kenneth M Suggs
Gerald D Jowers, Jr
Kent T Stair
Christina Perrin
Tyler Paul Winton
Exhibit A-Agreement for the Design & Construction of Interstate 85 Reconstructio
Exhibit B-Transportation Management Plan for SCDOT
Exhibit C-Brian Bottomley's Affidavit of Merit
(#5) MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/3/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Stair, Kent) (Entered: 11/19/2021)
(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc.(Stair, Kent) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
(#8) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc.(Stair, Kent) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
Docket(#8) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc.(Stair, Kent) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc.(Stair, Kent) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/3/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Stair, Kent) (Entered: 11/19/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (alew, ) (Entered: 09/29/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Thomas Goggin.(alew, ) (Entered: 09/29/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10097794.), filed by Thomas Goggin. Service due by 12/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Agreement for the Design & Construction of Interstate 85 Reconstruction, #2 Exhibit B-Transportation Management Plan for SCDOT, #3 Exhibit C-Brian Bottomley's Affidavit of Merit)(alew, ) (Entered: 09/29/2021)
[-] Read Less