This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:41:57 (UTC).

GOGGANS v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence case was filed by GOGGANS against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-17218

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Anne E. Thompson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LACY J. GOGGANS

Respondent

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) CJA 20: Appointment of Attorney MARK W. CATANZARO as CJA counsel for LACY J. GOGGANS. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 10/8/2019. (adi, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER that the Court sua sponte appoints counsel for Petitioner, 18 U.S.C. 3006A. The Clerk of the Court shall identify an attorney from the CJA list for appointment. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 10/03/2019. (jmh) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#2

(#2) Letter from LACY J. GOGGANS requesting a status report as to Petitioner's Habeas Corpus petition. (jem) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#2

(#3) ORDER that the parties shall confer and submit a status report within 60 days of the entry of this Order; Ordering that a motion be filed if new counsel needs to be appointed within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 9/17/2019. (eaj) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

1 #1

Order

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 02-cr-00320-AET-1, filed by LACY J. GOGGANS. (Attachments: #1 Order)(jdb) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CJA 20: Appointment of Attorney MARK W. CATANZARO as CJA counsel for LACY J. GOGGANS. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 10/8/2019. (adi, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's note: copy of #4 sent to Petitioner via regular mail to FCI Gilmer, P.O. Box 6000, Glenville, WV 26351. (adi, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER that the Court sua sponte appoints counsel for Petitioner, 18 U.S.C. 3006A. The Clerk of the Court shall identify an attorney from the CJA list for appointment. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 10/03/2019. (jmh) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER that the parties shall confer and submit a status report within 60 days of the entry of this Order; Ordering that a motion be filed if new counsel needs to be appointed within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 9/17/2019. (eaj) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter from LACY J. GOGGANS requesting a status report as to Petitioner's Habeas Corpus petition. (jem) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 02-cr-00320-AET-1, filed by LACY J. GOGGANS. (Attachments: #1 Order)(jdb) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.