This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/17/2020 at 07:59:35 (UTC).

Goffard v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston

Case Summary

On 02/17/2020 Goffard filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William C Griesbach. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00251

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William C Griesbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gwen Goffard

Defendant

Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John F Mayer

Attorney at Nash Spindler Grimstad & McCracken LLP

1425 Memorial Dr

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Sean A Bukowski

Attorney at Nash Spindler Grimstad & McCracken LLP

1425 Memorial Dr

Manitowoc, WI 54220

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gwen Goffard. (Mayer, John)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean A Bukowski on behalf of Gwen Goffard. Attorney(s) appearing: Sean A. Bukowski (Bukowski, Sean)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John F Mayer on behalf of Gwen Goffard. Attorney(s) appearing: Sean A. Bukowski (Mayer, John) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/2/2020) (lh).

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston by Gwen Goffard. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3364686)(Mayer, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/18/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Dismissed with prejudice and without costs pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), upon the #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff. (lh)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gwen Goffard. (Mayer, John)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean A Bukowski on behalf of Gwen Goffard. Attorney(s) appearing: Sean A. Bukowski (Bukowski, Sean)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John F Mayer on behalf of Gwen Goffard. Attorney(s) appearing: Sean A. Bukowski (Mayer, John) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/2/2020) (lh).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston by Gwen Goffard. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3364686)(Mayer, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/18/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean A Bukowski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John F. Mayer