This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2020 at 09:50:45 (UTC).

Goff v. Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 Goff filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Arthur J Gallagher Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert T. Dawson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-06130

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert T. Dawson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Jeff Goff

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Lloyd W. Kitchens, III

Attorney at Brad Hendricks Law Firm

500 C Pleasant Valley Drive

Little Rock, AR 72227

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Melissa Kimberly Hodges

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart

6410 Poplar Avenue, Suite 300

Memphis, TN 38119

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A: Plaintiff's Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B: Declaration of Steven Stoll

1 #3

Exhibit C: Certified State Court Records (Garland Co. Cir. Ct-Arkansas)

1 #4

Exhibit D: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Garland Co.)

#2

#3

#4

#5

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 11/12/2020 09:00 AM in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 16, 2020. (hnc) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (Hodges, Melissa) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER/REPLY to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Answer to Counterclaim by Jeff Goff.(Kitchens, Lloyd) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/10/2020. Bench Trial set for 11/12/2020 09:00 AM in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 16, 2019. (hnc) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #4 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM for Injunctive Relief and Damages against Jeff Goff by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co..(Hodges, Melissa) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. shall have through 12/6/2019 to file its answer. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 2, 2019. (mcc) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (Hodges, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2022804.. (Hodges, Melissa) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT against Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., filed by Jeff Goff. (Originally filed in the Circuit Court of Garland County, Arkansas on 10/23/2019 in case 26CV-19-1427)(mjm) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (mjm) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 11/25/2019. (mjm) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Garland County, Arkansas, case number 26CV-19-1427., filed by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Declaration of Steven Stoll, #3 Exhibit C: Certified State Court Records (Garland Co. Cir. Ct-Arkansas), #4 Exhibit D: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Garland Co.))(mjm) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa Kimberly Hodges