This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/05/2022 at 04:01:27 (UTC).

Goff #186716 v. Arizona, State of et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 Goff 186716 filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Arizona, State of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas L Rayes and James F Metcalf (PS). The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00663

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas L Rayes

Referral Judge

James F Metcalf (PS)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shawn Charles Goff

Buckeye, AZ 85326

Defendants

Arizona, State of

David Shinn

Jason Bremer

Unknown Rochin

Donald Linville

Unknown Young

Centurion

E Curtis

Monique Marshall

Micaela Williams Reece

Yvonne Moese

Anthony Coleman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Kathleen L Wieneke

Attorney at Wieneke Law Group

1225 W Washington St., Ste. 313

Tempe, AZ 85288

Laura Anne Van Buren

Attorney at Wieneke Law Group PLC

1225 W. Washington St.., Ste. 313

Tempe, AZ 85288

Brendan Francis Porter

Attorney at Wieneke Law Group

1225 W Washington St., Ste. 313

Tempe, AZ 85288

Sarah Lynn Barnes

Attorney at Broening Oberg Woods & Wilson PC - Phoenix, AZ

2800 N Central Ave., Ste. 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) NOTICE: Acknowledgment of Receipt of Certified Order and Remand Letter. (SST) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#16

(#16) NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Shawn Charles Goff: #186716, BUCKEYE-AZ-LEWIS-ASPC-RAST, RAST UN, P.O. BOX 70, BUCKEYE, AZ 85326. (CLM) (2 pages) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

15 #1

Remand Letter

15 #15

Main Document

#14

(#14) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arizona, State of, Jason Bremer, Centurion, Anthony Coleman, E Curtis, Donald Linville, Monique Marshall, Yvonne Moese, Micaela Williams Reece, Unknown Rochin, David Shinn, Unknown Young filed by Shawn Charles Goff. (18 Pages) (REK) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Laura Anne Van Buren. (Van Buren, Laura) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen L Wieneke on behalf of Arizona, State of, Jason Bremer, Unknown Curtis, Donald Linville, Unknown Rochin, David Shinn, Unknown Young. (Wieneke, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER: Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff has 45 days from the filing date of this Order to file an amended complaint using the court-approved form included with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 45 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. (See Order for full details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/9/22. (SST) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE re: #9 Order filed by Plaintiff Shawn Charles Goff. (SMH) (4 pages) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court, Request for Counsel, and Dismissal Without Prejudice (Doc. #8 ) is denied as to Plaintiff's request to remand this case to Maricopa County Superior Court and his request for appointment of counsel. Within 30 days of the filing date of this Order, Plaintiff must file a response that clarifies whether he wishes to file an amended complaint in this case or whether he wishes to voluntarily dismiss this case. Plaintiff's response shall be limited to this issue. If Plaintiff fails to file a response within 30 days, the Court will assume that Plaintiff wishes to voluntarily dismiss this case and will enter an appropriate Order. (See Order for full details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/11/22. (SST) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Remand to State Court, MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Titled: Plaintiff's Consolidated Response to Defendants' Notice of Removal, Request for Counsel, and for Dismissal Without Prejudice and Hearing Requested and Remand) by Shawn Charles Goff. (4 Pages) (REK) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Service by Shawn Charles Goff. (2 Pages) (REK) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: (1) Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 -3 at 20-28) is dismissed for failure to comply with Rule 3.4 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. (2) If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. (3) The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/4/22. (SMH) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#5

(#5) AMENDED NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to reflect correct file date. (BAC) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #2

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE: Acknowledgment of Receipt of Certified Order and Remand Letter. (SST) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Shawn Charles Goff: #186716, BUCKEYE-AZ-LEWIS-ASPC-RAST, RAST UN, P.O. BOX 70, BUCKEYE, AZ 85326. (CLM) (2 pages) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER: The First Amended Complaint (Doc. #14 ) and this case are remanded to Maricopa County Superior Court. The Clerk of Court must mail a certified copy of this Order to: Jeff Fine, Clerk of the Superior Court, Maricopa County, Arizona Superior Court, 201 West Jefferson, Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2205. The Clerk of Court must close this federal case. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/2/22. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (SST) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arizona, State of, Jason Bremer, Centurion, Anthony Coleman, E Curtis, Donald Linville, Monique Marshall, Yvonne Moese, Micaela Williams Reece, Unknown Rochin, David Shinn, Unknown Young filed by Shawn Charles Goff. (18 Pages) (REK) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Laura Anne Van Buren. (Van Buren, Laura) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen L Wieneke on behalf of Arizona, State of, Jason Bremer, Unknown Curtis, Donald Linville, Unknown Rochin, David Shinn, Unknown Young. (Wieneke, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff has 45 days from the filing date of this Order to file an amended complaint using the court-approved form included with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 45 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. (See Order for full details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/9/22. (SST) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE re: #9 Order filed by Plaintiff Shawn Charles Goff. (SMH) (4 pages) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court, Request for Counsel, and Dismissal Without Prejudice (Doc. #8 ) is denied as to Plaintiff's request to remand this case to Maricopa County Superior Court and his request for appointment of counsel. Within 30 days of the filing date of this Order, Plaintiff must file a response that clarifies whether he wishes to file an amended complaint in this case or whether he wishes to voluntarily dismiss this case. Plaintiff's response shall be limited to this issue. If Plaintiff fails to file a response within 30 days, the Court will assume that Plaintiff wishes to voluntarily dismiss this case and will enter an appropriate Order. (See Order for full details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/11/22. (SST) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Remand to State Court, MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Titled: Plaintiff's Consolidated Response to Defendants' Notice of Removal, Request for Counsel, and for Dismissal Without Prejudice and Hearing Requested and Remand) by Shawn Charles Goff. (4 Pages) (REK) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Service by Shawn Charles Goff. (2 Pages) (REK) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: (1) Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 -3 at 20-28) is dismissed for failure to comply with Rule 3.4 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. (2) If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. (3) The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/4/22. (SMH) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to reflect correct file date. (BAC) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) *AMENDED by Doc. #5 . AMENDED NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (BAC) Modified on 4/25/2022 (BAC). (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. Please review the attached documents. (BAC) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • Docket***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Notice of Service re: Summons, Waiver of Service of Summons, and Complaint upon Centurion, Donald Linville on 3/7/22 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 3/28/22). Notice of Service re: Summons, Waiver of Service of Summons, and Complaint upon Unknown Rochin (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 2/24/22). (BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AMENDED by Doc. #4 . NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (BAC) Modified on 4/25/2022 (BAC). (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-016191. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20582839 filed by Centurion. (Barnes, Sarah) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A)(BAC) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Centurion Ltd is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Lynn Barnes Esquire

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathleen L Wieneke