This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/18/2020 at 07:57:52 (UTC).

Goethe v. Westlake Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 Goethe filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Westlake Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Campbell Barker and John D. Love. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00085

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Campbell Barker

Referral Judge

John D. Love

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frank Goethe

Defendants

Westlake Services, LLC

Muggle Towing, LLC

Par, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brandon Adam Block

Attorney at Law Offices of Brandon A Block, A Professional Corporation

433 North Camden Drive, Suite 600

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Alexander Burnaby Trueblood

Attorney at Trueblood Law Firm

10940 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorney

Daniel M Karp

Attorney at Fee Smith Sharp & Vitullo, LLP - Dallas

Three Galleria Tower, 13155 Noel Rd, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75240

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE that the scheduling conference set for April 23, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. has been CANCELLED. (srb) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Frank Goethe. (Block, Brandon) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER setting Scheduling/Telephone Conference for 4/23/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/18/20. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendants' Joint ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Muggle Towing, LLC, Par, Inc., Westlake Services, LLC.(Karp, Daniel) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank Goethe. Westlake Services, LLC served on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (Block, Brandon) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank Goethe. Par, Inc. served on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (Block, Brandon) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank Goethe. Muggle Towing, LLC served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (Block, Brandon) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER DESIGNATING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to handle all pretrial matters in this case, including dispositive motions. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 02/21/20. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Burnaby Trueblood on behalf of Frank Goethe (Trueblood, Alexander) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Muggle Towing, LLC, Par, Inc., and Westlake Services, LLC and emailed to plaintiff to serve. (ndc) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER adopting in this case Judge Barker's standing orders, which may be obtained from his court-website page. Noncompliance with those standing orders may result in a sanction or other disadvantage. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDistrict Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Frank Goethe. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7668716.), filed by Frank Goethe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Block, Brandon) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Par Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander B Trueblood

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon A. Block