This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2021 at 06:55:13 (UTC).

Goel v. Khurana

Case Summary

On August 26, 2021, Meera Goel (“Goel” or “Plaintiff''), represented by Christian Tiblier and Joel Edward Roberts of Baker & Hostetler LLP, filed a personal property fraud lawsuit against Raj K. Khurana (“Khurana” or “Defendant''), seeking damages together with interest for the alleged fraudulent conduct of the Defendant. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Southern District of Florida with Judge Jose E. Martinez presiding.

 

In its complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Throughout the entirety of their relationship, Khurana used his influence and his position of trust with Dr. Goel to induce her to transfer him large sums of money and make purchases on his behalf”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “In late 2016, Khurana began pressuring Dr. Goel to transfer him hundreds of thousands of dollars which he claimed he needed to finalize a divorce. Khurana claimed he could afford his divorce, but it would take 1-2 years for him to do so. Thus, Khurana’s ultimatum to Dr. Goel was if their relationship was to continue, Dr. Goel would need to pay. Dr. Goel complied”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “On November 30, 2016, Dr. Goel transferred to Khurana $270,000, and on February 2, 2017, Dr. Goel transferred to Khurana $450,000, both of which were meant to be used solely to assist in finalizing Khurana’s divorce. However, on information and belief, the $720,000 transferred to Khurana was not used as intended but was, instead, used to pay for Khurana’s lifestyle at Dr. Goel’s expense.”

 

The Plaintiff even further alleged that “On April 26, 2021 Khurana, using Sharon Flood as the agent, sold the Florida Condo for $1,850,000 without providing any notice to Dr. Goel. Dr. Goel received no proceeds from the sale. Instead, Khurana kept all the proceeds despite contributing nothing to the purchase price, renovations, taxes, or maintenance fees. Dr. Goel and her counsel were unaware that the sale of the Florida Condo occurred.”

 

The Plaintiff has laid down four claims for relief. The first claim alleged deals with unjust enrichment, the second claim alleged is for conversion, the third claim alleged is for fraud wherein the Defendant misrepresented that a foreign national could not own property in Florida. The fourth claim alleged is for fraud wherein the Defendant misrepresented that he needed $720,000 to finalize his divorce.

 

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court to pass a judgement for damages, together with interest, and impose a constructive or resulting trust to the extent necessary for return of the proceeds of the sale of the Florida Condo and any other relief that the Court deems just and proper.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-23082

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jose E. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Meera Goel

Defendant

Raj K Khurana

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joel Edward Roberts

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

Suntrust Center, Suite 2300, 200 South Orange Avenue

Orlando, FL 32801-3432

Judah C. Lieblich

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

200 South Orange Avenue Suite 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

Christian Tiblier

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

200 South Orange Avenue, Suite 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Judah C. Lieblich, mailing date August 27, 2021, (pt) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Raj K Khurana. (ebz) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

1 #3

Summon(s) - Raj K. Khurana

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Use and Occupancy Agreement

1 #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Judah C. Lieblich, mailing date August 27, 2021, (pt) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Raj K Khurana. (ebz) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Raj K Khurana. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14960290, filed by Meera Goel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Use and Occupancy Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s) - Raj K. Khurana)(Tiblier, Christian) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christian Tiblier