This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2022 at 07:48:09 (UTC).

Goebel & Company Furniture, LLC et al v. Cincinnati Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 Goebel Company Furniture, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Cincinnati Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jean C. Hamilton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00036

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jean C. Hamilton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Goebel & Company Furniture, LLC

Withers Holdings, LLC

Defendants

Cincinnati Insurance Company

Cheryl Ellegood

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas D. Brown

Attorney at THE LAW FIRM OF THOMAS SANFILIPPO AND ASSOCIATES LLC

211 N. Broadway, Suite 2100

St. Louis, MO 63102

Thomas James SanFilippo

Attorney at THOMAS SANFILIPPO AND ASSOCIATES LLC

One Metropolitan Square, 211 N. Broadway

St. Louis, MO 63102

Defendant Attorneys

Brandon B. Copeland

Attorney at BROWN AND JAMES PC - St Louis

800 Market St., Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

David P. Bub

Attorney at BROWN AND JAMES PC - St Louis

800 Market St., Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge David D. Noce termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Jean C. Hamilton for all further proceedings (KJS) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

13 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Motion to Dismiss

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Party Cheryl Ellegood (Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss) filed by Defendant Cheryl Ellegood. (Copeland, Brandon) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiffs Goebel & Company Furniture, LLC, Withers Holdings, LLC. (Brown, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Party Cheryl Ellegood filed by Plaintiffs Goebel & Company Furniture, LLC, Withers Holdings, LLC. (Brown, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Copeland, Brandon) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#7

(#7) SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet by Defendants Cincinnati Insurance Company, Cheryl Ellegood. (Copeland, Brandon) Modified on 1/11/2022 to edit docket text(JKL). (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#6

(#6) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Goebel & Company Furniture, LLC, Withers Holdings, LLC.(JKL) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Company. Parent companies: Cincinnati Financial Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Copeland, Brandon) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss Party Cheryl Ellegood by Defendant Cheryl Ellegood. (Copeland, Brandon) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Cincinnati Insurance Company, Cheryl Ellegood Sent To: Plaintiff (Copeland, Brandon) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by David P. Bub for Defendants Cincinnati Insurance Company, Cheryl Ellegood. (Bub, David) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit C

1 #2

Original Filing Form Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis City, case number 2122-CC09871, with receipt number AMOEDC-9066925, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Cheryl Ellegood, Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Original Filing Form Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit C)(Copeland, Brandon) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge David D. Noce termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Jean C. Hamilton for all further proceedings (KJS) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketNotice from Clerk instructing Defendant Cheryl Ellegood, Plaintiffs Goebel & Company Furniture, LLC, Withers Holdings, LLC to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 2/24/2022. (KJS) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketNotice from Clerk instructing Defendant Cheryl Ellegood, Plaintiffs Goebel & Company Furniture, LLC, Withers Holdings, LLC to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 2/22/2022. (KJS) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court (Response to Motion for Remand) filed by Defendants Cincinnati Insurance Company, Cheryl Ellegood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Motion to Dismiss)(Copeland, Brandon) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Party Cheryl Ellegood (Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss) filed by Defendant Cheryl Ellegood. (Copeland, Brandon) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiffs Goebel & Company Furniture, LLC, Withers Holdings, LLC. (Brown, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Party Cheryl Ellegood filed by Plaintiffs Goebel & Company Furniture, LLC, Withers Holdings, LLC. (Brown, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Copeland, Brandon) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Docket(#8) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCase Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (JKL) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet by Defendants Cincinnati Insurance Company, Cheryl Ellegood. (Copeland, Brandon) Modified on 1/11/2022 to edit docket text(JKL). (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Goebel & Company Furniture, LLC, Withers Holdings, LLC.(JKL) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Company. Parent companies: Cincinnati Financial Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Copeland, Brandon) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss Party Cheryl Ellegood by Defendant Cheryl Ellegood. (Copeland, Brandon) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Cincinnati Insurance Company, Cheryl Ellegood Sent To: Plaintiff (Copeland, Brandon) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by David P. Bub for Defendants Cincinnati Insurance Company, Cheryl Ellegood. (Bub, David) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis City, case number 2122-CC09871, with receipt number AMOEDC-9066925, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Cheryl Ellegood, Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Original Filing Form Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit C)(Copeland, Brandon) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David P. Bub

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon Copeland