This case was last updated from PACER on 05/02/2020 at 08:55:03 (UTC).

Godwin v. Guardian Capital Management Hawaii, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 Godwin filed an Other lawsuit against Guardian Capital Management Hawaii, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are HELEN GILLMOR and WES REBER PORTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00098

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HELEN GILLMOR

Referral Judge

WES REBER PORTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gregory Godwin

Defendant

Guardian Capital Management Hawaii, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Justin A. Brackett

515 Ward Avenue

Honolulu, HI 96814

 

Court Documents

10 #10

Certificate of Service

10 #9

Supplement Verification of Amended Complaint

10 #8

Exhibit 8

10 #7

Exhibit 7

10 #6

Exhibit 6

10 #5

Exhibit 5

10 #4

Exhibit 4

10 #3

Exhibit 3

10 #2

Exhibit 2

10 #1

Exhibit 1

#10

(#10) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Guardian Capital Management Hawaii, LLC, filed by Gregory Godwin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Supplement Verification of Amended Complaint, #10 Certificate of Service)(Brackett, Justin) Docket Text Modified on 4/24/2020 (jo) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory Godwin. Guardian Capital Management Hawaii, LLC served on 3/5/2020. (Brackett, Justin) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Guardian Capital Management Hawaii, LLC (jo) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

5 #2

Waiver of the Service of Summons

5 #1

Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons

#5

(#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

4 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement

#4

(#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 4/28/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Guardian Capital Management Hawaii, LLC, filed by Gregory Godwin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Supplement Verification of Amended Complaint, #10 Certificate of Service)(Brackett, Justin) Docket Text Modified on 4/24/2020 (jo) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • Docket(#9) EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for June 8, 2020 at 9:00 AM will be held by telephone. The Court will be using AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendant. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docket(#8) EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 04/28/2020 is CONTINUED to 6/08/2020 at 09:00AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Plaintiff shall notify Defendant of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory Godwin. Guardian Capital Management Hawaii, LLC served on 3/5/2020. (Brackett, Justin) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Guardian Capital Management Hawaii, LLC (jo) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 4/28/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00098 HG-WRP on all further pleadings. (jo) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Damages, Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Guardian Capital Management Hawaii, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2342032.), filed by Gregory Godwin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Declaration Verification of Complaint)(Brackett, Justin) Docket Text Modified on 3/3/2020 (jo) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less