This case was last updated from PACER on 08/10/2021 at 09:17:42 (UTC).

Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 v. Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00213

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1

Defendants

Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson

Ericsson, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lance W Shapiro

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP - New York

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Samuel Lawrence Brenner

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP - Boston

800 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02199-3600

Shong Yin

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP - East Palo Alto

1900 University Ave, 6Th Floor

East Pala Alto, CA 94303

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Alexander Ernest Middleton

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP - NY

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036-8704

James R Batchelder

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP - East Palo Alto

1900 University Ave, 6Th Floor

East Pala Alto, CA 94303

Kevin John Post

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP - New York

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Matthew Richard Shapiro

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP - New York

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Steven Pepe

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP - New York

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorney

Nicholas M Mathews

Attorney at McKool Smith, PC - Dallas

300 Crescent Court, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/6/2021. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

15 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#15

(#15) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mathews, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1. Ericsson, Inc. served on 6/14/2021, answer due 7/5/2021. (Batchelder, James) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

13 #1

Summons(es)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Issued as to Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shong Yin on behalf of Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 (Yin, Shong) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin John Post on behalf of Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 (Post, Kevin) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Pepe on behalf of Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 (Pepe, Steven) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

1 #8

Exhibit 7

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8450728.), filed by Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 6/11/2021 (ch, ). (Entered: 06/11/2021)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due Deadline Updated for Ericsson, Inc. to 9/3/2021; Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson to 9/3/2021. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/6/2021. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mathews, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1. Ericsson, Inc. served on 6/14/2021, answer due 7/5/2021. (Batchelder, James) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Issued as to Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shong Yin on behalf of Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 (Yin, Shong) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin John Post on behalf of Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 (Post, Kevin) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Pepe on behalf of Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 (Pepe, Steven) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Ernest Middleton on behalf of Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 (Middleton, Alexander) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Richard Shapiro on behalf of Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 (Shapiro, Matthew) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Lawrence Brenner on behalf of Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 (Brenner, Samuel) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James R Batchelder on behalf of Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 (Batchelder, James) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance W Shapiro on behalf of Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 (Shapiro, Lance) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8450728.), filed by Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 6/11/2021 (ch, ). (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON is a litigant

Latest cases where ERICSSON INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas M Mathews