This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/24/2021 at 09:05:22 (UTC).

Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 v. Micron Technology, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 filed an Other lawsuit against Micron Technology, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alex G. Tse. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-MC-80152

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alex G. Tse

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1

Defendants

Micron Semiconductor Products Inc.

Micron Technology Texas, LLC

Micron Technology, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

RPX Corpoaration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Geoffrey Gavin Moss

Attorney at Orrick Herrington Sutcliffe LLP

777 S Figueroa St, Suite 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Jared Bobrow

Attorney at Orrick, Herringotn & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Jeremy Jason Lang

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

#6

#5

#4

2 #10

*Restricted*

2 #9

*Restricted*

2 #8

*Restricted*

2 #7

*Restricted*

2 #6

*Restricted*

2 #5

Redacted - Declaration of Geoffrey Moss ISO Motion to Compel

2 #4

*Restricted*

2 #3

Redacted - Motion to Compel (RPX Subpoena)

2 #2

Proposed Order

2 #1

Declaration of Geoffrey Moss

#2

1 #7

Exhibit E

1 #6

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #2

Proposed Order

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting #4 Stipulation to Dismiss Miscellaneous Action. (agtlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting #2 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (agtlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Miscellaneous Action filed by Micron Semiconductor Products Inc., Micron Technology Texas, LLC, Micron Technology, Inc.. (Moss, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/5/2021) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2021) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Third Party RPX Corporation to Comply With Subpoena Duces Tecum and Deposition Subpoena filed by Micron Semiconductor Products Inc., Micron Technology Texas, LLC, Micron Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey Moss, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted - Motion to Compel (RPX Subpoena), #4 Unredacted - Motion to Compel (RPX Subpoena), #5 Redacted - Declaration of Geoffrey Moss ISO Motion to Compel, #6 Unredacted - Declaration of Geoffrey Moss ISO Motion to Compel, #7 Unredacted - Ex. C, #8 Unredacted - Ex. D, #9 Unredacted - Ex. F, #10 Unredacted - Ex. G)(Moss, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/25/2021) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION TO COMPEL against RPX Corpoaration ( Filing fee $ 49, receipt number 0971-16117290.). Filed by Micron Technology Texas, LLC, Micron Semiconductor Products Inc., Micron Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey Moss, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G)(Moss, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/25/2021) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MICRON SEMICONDUCTOR PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Geoffrey G Moss

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jared Bobrow Esq.