This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/29/2021 at 07:20:09 (UTC).

Godinez v. Merchants Credit Guide Co.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Godinez filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Merchants Credit Guide Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Martha M. Pacold. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03493

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martha M. Pacold

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Janai Godinez

Defendant

Merchants Credit Guide Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marwan R. Daher

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

2500 S. Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Omar Tayseer Sulaiman

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

2500 S. Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Mohammed Omar Badwan

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

2500 S. Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Defendant Attorneys

David M Schultz

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jennifer W. Weller

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 N. Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The court has reviewed the Notice of Settlement #12 . The status report filing date of 9/1/2021 is stricken. The parties should file a joint status report by 10/15/2021 updating the court on the status of settlement, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed prior that date. (rao, ) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE by Janai Godinez of Settlement (Daher, Marwan) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendant's unopposed motion for 21-day enlargement of time to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint #10 is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint by 8/26/2021. The parties are directed to file the initial joint status report by 9/1/2021. (rao, ) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#10

(#10) MOTION by Defendant Merchants Credit Guide Co. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Unopposed) (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Merchants Credit Guide Co. by Jennifer W. Weller (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Merchants Credit Guide Co. by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

7 #1

Initial Status Report outline

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 8/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, ) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janai Godinez as to Merchants Credit Guide Co. on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (Sulaiman, Omar) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Janai Godinez by Mohammed Omar Badwan (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Janai Godinez by Marwan R. Daher (Daher, Marwan) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Janai Godinez by Omar Tayseer Sulaiman (Sulaiman, Omar) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sulaiman, Omar) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Janai Godinez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18407270.(Sulaiman, Omar) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The court has reviewed the Notice of Settlement #12 . The status report filing date of 9/1/2021 is stricken. The parties should file a joint status report by 10/15/2021 updating the court on the status of settlement, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed prior that date. (rao, ) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE by Janai Godinez of Settlement (Daher, Marwan) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendant's unopposed motion for 21-day enlargement of time to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint #10 is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint by 8/26/2021. The parties are directed to file the initial joint status report by 9/1/2021. (rao, ) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION by Defendant Merchants Credit Guide Co. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Unopposed) (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Merchants Credit Guide Co. by Jennifer W. Weller (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Merchants Credit Guide Co. by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 8/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, ) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janai Godinez as to Merchants Credit Guide Co. on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (Sulaiman, Omar) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Janai Godinez by Mohammed Omar Badwan (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Merchants Credit Guide Co. (lxk, ) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, ) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Janai Godinez by Marwan R. Daher (Daher, Marwan) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Janai Godinez by Omar Tayseer Sulaiman (Sulaiman, Omar) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sulaiman, Omar) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Janai Godinez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18407270.(Sulaiman, Omar) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Merchants Credit Guide Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Weller

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M. Schultz