This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2022 at 07:41:43 (UTC).

Godfrey v. Fuda

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 Godfrey filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Fuda. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John R. Adams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00225

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Adams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paulette Godfrey

Defendant

Frank Fuda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David L. Engler

181 Elm Road, Ne

Warren, OH 44483

Defendant Attorney

Kathleen M. Minahan

Attorney at Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Solon

100 Franklin'S Row, 34305 Solon Road

Solon, OH 44139

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) Supplement to Complaint - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Paulette Godfrey. Related document(s) #1 . (Engler, David) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#4

(#4) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Frank Fuda. (Minahan, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Exhibit A - Notice of Manual Filing of Thumbdrive - 3/24/2021 Board Meeting

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Notice of manual filing

#7

(#7) Motion to Exclude Evidence or, In the Alternative, to Convert to a Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Paulette Godfrey. Related document(s) #5 . (Engler, David). Modified to add second motion part on 3/30/2022 (O,K). (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#8

(#8) Brief in Opposition to #7 Motion to Exclude Evidence and/or convert to Motion for summary judgment filed by Frank Fuda. (Minahan, Kathleen) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Brief in Opposition to #7 Motion to Exclude Evidence and/or convert to Motion for summary judgment filed by Frank Fuda. (Minahan, Kathleen) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to Exclude Evidence or, In the Alternative, to Convert to a Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Paulette Godfrey. Related document(s) #5 . (Engler, David). Modified to add second motion part on 3/30/2022 (O,K). (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Exhibit A 03/24/2021 Board Meeting (Thumb Drive) to #5 Motion for judgment on the pleadings filed by Frank Fuda. (Thumb drive on file in the Akron Clerk's Office) (Attachments: #1 Notice of manual filing) (O,K) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion for judgment on the pleadings with Brief filed by Defendant Frank Fuda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Manual Filing of Thumbdrive - 3/24/2021 Board Meeting)(Minahan, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Frank Fuda. (Minahan, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Frank Fuda. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (D,Ju) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (D,Ju) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketJudge John R. Adams assigned to case. (D,Ju) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Supplement to Complaint - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Paulette Godfrey. Related document(s) #1 . (Engler, David) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Frank Fuda. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11262055.. Filed by Paulette Godfrey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet (corrupt document see ECF#2) , #2 Summons) (Engler, David) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathleen M. Minahan