This case was last updated from PACER on 02/28/2020 at 08:24:48 (UTC).

GODA et al v. CUMMINGS et al

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 GODA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CUMMINGS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JAN E. DUBOIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-06178

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAN E. DUBOIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHN GODA

CINDY GODA

Defendants

KEITH CUMMINGS

CT TRANSPORTATION, LLC

COMCAR INDUSTRIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES R. RADMORE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JAMES R. RADMORE PC

Two Penn Ctr Ste 520, 1500 Jfk Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorney

CRAIG J. RENITSKY

Attorney at MARKS O'NEILL O'BRIEN DOHERTY & KELLY PC

1617 John F Kennedy Blvd, Suite 1010

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Certificate of Service

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by COMCAR INDUSTRIES, CT TRANSPORTATION, LLC, KEITH CUMMINGS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDERED THAT THE MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. #2 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT. DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN THE TIME PROVIDED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 2/6/2020.2/7/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against COMCAR INDUSTRIES, CT TRANSPORTATION, LLC, KEITH CUMMINGS, filed by CINDY GODA, JOHN GODA. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(sg, ) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 1/22/2020. 1/23/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#3

(#3) Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs or relief other than monetary damages is sought (RADMORE, JAMES) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

2 #5

Exhibit

2 #4

Exhibit

2 #3

Certificate of Service

2 #2

Text of Proposed Order

2 #1

Memorandum

#2

(#2) MOTION to Dismiss filed by COMCAR INDUSTRIES, CT TRANSPORTATION, LLC, KEITH CUMMINGS.MEMORANDUM AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COMCAR INDUSTRIES, CT TRANSPORTATION, LLC, KEITH CUMMINGS from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, case number 191102584. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE208968), EXHIBITS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(rf, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/31/2019) (rf, ). (Entered: 12/31/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by COMCAR INDUSTRIES, CT TRANSPORTATION, LLC, KEITH CUMMINGS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDERED THAT THE MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. #2 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT. DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN THE TIME PROVIDED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 2/6/2020.2/7/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against COMCAR INDUSTRIES, CT TRANSPORTATION, LLC, KEITH CUMMINGS, filed by CINDY GODA, JOHN GODA. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(sg, ) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 1/22/2020. 1/23/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Docket(#4) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (amas) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs or relief other than monetary damages is sought (RADMORE, JAMES) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Dismiss filed by COMCAR INDUSTRIES, CT TRANSPORTATION, LLC, KEITH CUMMINGS.MEMORANDUM AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • Case Eligible for Arbitration(rf, ) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COMCAR INDUSTRIES, CT TRANSPORTATION, LLC, KEITH CUMMINGS from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, case number 191102584. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE208968), EXHIBITS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(rf, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/31/2019) (rf, ). (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Comcar Industries Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where CT Transportation LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRAIG J. RENITSKY