This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:13:26 (UTC).

Goble v. DG Retail, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Goble filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against DG Retail, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ann L. Aiken. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-01976

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ann L. Aiken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Goble

Defendants

DG Retail, LLC

Kevin Wagner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sharia Mayfield

Attorney at Law Office of Jon Weiner

1415 Commercial St. Se

Salem, OR 97302

Jon H. Weiner

Attorney at Jon H. Weiner, Attorney at Law

1415 Commercial St Se

Salem, OR 97302

Defendant Attorney

William E. Weiner

Attorney at Lane Powell, PC

601 Sw Second Avenue, Suite 2100

Portland, OR 97204-3158

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Weiner, William) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#11

(#11) Declaration of William E. Weiner in Support of Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Submit Case to Binding Arbitration and Stay Action. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Stay #10 .) (Weiner, William) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#10

(#10) Unopposed Motion for Stay to Submit Case to Binding Arbitration. Filed by All Defendants. (Weiner, William) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#9

(#9) Affidavit of Service upon Kevin Wagner served on 12/21/2019 Filed by James Goble. (Weiner, Jon) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#8

(#8) Affidavit of Service upon DG Retail, LLC served on 12/16/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mayfield, Sharia) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued Electronically as to Kevin Wagner. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued Electronically as to DG Retail, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons Filed by James Goble. (Mayfield, Sharia) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons Filed by James Goble. (Mayfield, Sharia) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/3/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/4/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 5/4/2020. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (kf) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 12/5/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6110135 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by James Goble against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Mayfield, Sharia) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Stay #10 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Weiner, William) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Declaration of William E. Weiner in Support of Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Submit Case to Binding Arbitration and Stay Action. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Stay #10 .) (Weiner, William) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed Motion for Stay to Submit Case to Binding Arbitration. Filed by All Defendants. (Weiner, William) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Affidavit of Service upon Kevin Wagner served on 12/21/2019 Filed by James Goble. (Weiner, Jon) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Affidavit of Service upon DG Retail, LLC served on 12/16/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mayfield, Sharia) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued Electronically as to Kevin Wagner. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued Electronically as to DG Retail, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons Filed by James Goble. (Mayfield, Sharia) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons Filed by James Goble. (Mayfield, Sharia) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/3/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/4/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 5/4/2020. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (kf) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 12/5/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6110135 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by James Goble against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Mayfield, Sharia) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DG Retail LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sharia Mayfield