This case was last updated from PACER on 01/31/2020 at 08:08:26 (UTC).

Goat Fashion Limited v. 1661, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 Goat Fashion Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against 1661, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul A. Engelmayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11045

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Engelmayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOAT FASHION LIMITED

Defendant

1661, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas Anthoney Telesca

Attorney at Ruskin Moscou Faltischek, P.C.

1425 Rxr Plaza, East Tower

Uniondale, NY 11556

Defendant Attorney

Marjorie Joan Peerce

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP (NYC)

1675 Broadway, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/28/2020) (jca) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

14 #3

Exhibit 3

14 #2

Exhibit 2

14 #1

Exhibit 1

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by 1661, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Peerce, Marjorie) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#13

(#13) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Foot Locker, Inc., Other Affiliate Foot Locker Retail, Inc. for 1661, Inc.. Document filed by 1661, Inc..(Peerce, Marjorie) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Granted. (1661, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/9/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#11

(#11) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Marjorie J. Peerce dated January 9, 2019. Document filed by 1661, Inc..(Peerce, Marjorie) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#10

(#10) FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 1661, Inc..(Peerce, Marjorie) Modified on 1/21/2020 (lb). (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by GOAT FASHION LIMITED.(Telesca, Thomas) Modified on 12/16/2019 (ldi). (Entered: 12/02/2019)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 1661, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by GOAT FASHION LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Telesca, Thomas) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by 1661, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Peerce, Marjorie) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/28/2020) (jca) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by 1661, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Peerce, Marjorie) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Foot Locker, Inc., Other Affiliate Foot Locker Retail, Inc. for 1661, Inc.. Document filed by 1661, Inc..(Peerce, Marjorie) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Marjorie Joan Peerce to RE-FILE Document #10 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Granted. (1661, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/9/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Marjorie J. Peerce dated January 9, 2019. Document filed by 1661, Inc..(Peerce, Marjorie) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 1661, Inc..(Peerce, Marjorie) Modified on 1/21/2020 (lb). (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marjorie Joan Peerce on behalf of 1661, Inc.. (Peerce, Marjorie) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. 1661, Inc. served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. Service was accepted by Alana Wohlers, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Goat Fashion Limited. (Telesca, Thomas) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Goat Fashion Limited.(Telesca, Thomas) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2019
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Thomas Anthoney Telesca to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pne) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Thomas Anthoney Telesca. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas Anthoney Telesca. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Goat Fashion Limited. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pne) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas Anthoney Telesca. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by GOAT FASHION LIMITED.(Telesca, Thomas) Modified on 12/16/2019 (ldi). (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 1661, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by GOAT FASHION LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Telesca, Thomas) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against 1661, INC.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18184838)Document filed by GOAT FASHION LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Telesca, Thomas) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less