This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 06:23:48 (UTC).

GMG Development, LLC v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/18/2019 GMG Development, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale S. Fischer and Paul L. Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01996

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GMG Development, LLC

Defendants

Nationstar Mortgage, LLC

Nationstar Mortgage, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Mr. Cooper

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ernest J Franceschi, Jr

Attorney at Franceschi Law Corporation

800 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorneys

Zachary C Frampton

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 South Grand Avenue Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1514

Abraham J Colman

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 South Grand Avenue Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1514

Raffi Kassabian

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 South Grand Avenue Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1514

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Change of address by Ernest J Franceschi, Jr attorney for Plaintiff GMG Development, LLC. Changing attorneys address to 4640 Admiralty Way 5th Floor Marina del Rey, Ca. 90293. Filed by Plaintiff GMG Development, LLC. (Franceschi, Ernest) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#17

(#17) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge - DECLINED by Party #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initiate judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#16

(#16) ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. The Defendant does not consent. (Frampton, Zachary) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#15

(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT * Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement And L.R. 7.1-1 Notice Of Interested Parties Of Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper * filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC identifying Parties with a pecuniary interest in the outcome of this case are Plaintiff GMG Development, LLC and Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, dba Mr. Cooper. Nationstar is a Delaware Limited Liability Company. Nationstar is an indirect, wholly-owned subsidiary of a publicly-traded company, Mr. Cooper Group Inc. (formerly known as WMIH Corp.) (Mr. Cooper), a Delaware corporation. Nationstar is directly owned by two entities: (1) Nationstar Sub1 LLC ("Sub1") (99%) and (2) Nationstar Sub2 LLC ("Sub2") (1%). Both Sub1 and Sub2 are Delaware limited liability companies. Sub1 and Sub2 are both 100% owned by Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc. (NSM Holdings). NSM Holdings is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Mr. Cooper. More than 10% of the stock of Mr. Cooper is owned by KKR Wand Investors Corporation, a Cayman Islands corporation. as Corporate Parent. (Frampton, Zachary) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #10 * Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Coopers Answer And Affirmative Defenses To Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint * filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC.(Frampton, Zachary) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3) #11 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

11 #1

Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Nationsta

#11

(#11) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Nationstar Mortgage, LLC answer now due 5/3/2019, re Amended Complaint/Petition #10 filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC to Respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by Not More than 30 Days)(Attorney Zachary C Frampton added to party Nationstar Mortgage, LLC(pty:dft))(Frampton, Zachary) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

10 #1

Exhibit

#10

(#10) First AMENDED COMPLAINT Nationstar Mortgage, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff GMG Development, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Franceschi, Ernest) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#9

(#9) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (vv) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (car) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (car) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23393080 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff GMG Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney Ernest J Franceschi, Jr added to party GMG Development, LLC(pty:pla))(Franceschi, Ernest) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Change of address by Ernest J Franceschi, Jr attorney for Plaintiff GMG Development, LLC. Changing attorneys address to 4640 Admiralty Way 5th Floor Marina del Rey, Ca. 90293. Filed by Plaintiff GMG Development, LLC. (Franceschi, Ernest) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge - DECLINED by Party #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initiate judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. The Defendant does not consent. (Frampton, Zachary) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT * Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement And L.R. 7.1-1 Notice Of Interested Parties Of Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper * filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC identifying Parties with a pecuniary interest in the outcome of this case are Plaintiff GMG Development, LLC and Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, dba Mr. Cooper. Nationstar is a Delaware Limited Liability Company. Nationstar is an indirect, wholly-owned subsidiary of a publicly-traded company, Mr. Cooper Group Inc. (formerly known as WMIH Corp.) (Mr. Cooper), a Delaware corporation. Nationstar is directly owned by two entities: (1) Nationstar Sub1 LLC ("Sub1") (99%) and (2) Nationstar Sub2 LLC ("Sub2") (1%). Both Sub1 and Sub2 are Delaware limited liability companies. Sub1 and Sub2 are both 100% owned by Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc. (NSM Holdings). NSM Holdings is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Mr. Cooper. More than 10% of the stock of Mr. Cooper is owned by KKR Wand Investors Corporation, a Cayman Islands corporation. as Corporate Parent. (Frampton, Zachary) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #10 * Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Coopers Answer And Affirmative Defenses To Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint * filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC.(Frampton, Zachary) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3) #11 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Nationstar Mortgage, LLC answer now due 5/3/2019, re Amended Complaint/Petition #10 filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC to Respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by Not More than 30 Days)(Attorney Zachary C Frampton added to party Nationstar Mortgage, LLC(pty:dft))(Frampton, Zachary) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) First AMENDED COMPLAINT Nationstar Mortgage, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff GMG Development, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Franceschi, Ernest) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (vv) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (car) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (car) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff GMG Development, LLC. (Franceschi, Ernest) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff GMG Development, LLC, (Franceschi, Ernest) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff GMG Development, LLC. (Franceschi, Ernest) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23393080 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff GMG Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney Ernest J Franceschi, Jr added to party GMG Development, LLC(pty:pla))(Franceschi, Ernest) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ernest J Franceschi, Jr