This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:24:48 (UTC).

GM Reality Inc. v. Washington

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 GM Reality Inc filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Washington. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie L. White. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03209

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie L. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GM Reality Inc.

Defendant

Nicole Washington

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Leo Floodman, III

Attorney at FENDELMAN AND FLOODMAN, LLC

9666 Olive Blvd, Suite 690

St. Louis, MO 63132

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See Fed.R.Civ.P.12(h)(3). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. A separate Order of Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/23/2020. (TMT) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall show cause within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order why this matter should not be remanded to the St. Louis County Circuit Court for lack jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's failure to respond to this Order in a timely manner will result in a dismissal of this action, without prejudice. (Show Cause Response due by 1/9/2020.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/19/2019. (TMT) (Main Document 8 replaced on 1/2/2020) (TMT). (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and FEDERAL STAY OF EVICTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C.A. 1446(D) by Defendant Nicole Washington (KCB) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Nicole Washington. (Attachments: #1 State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(MFG) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) Letter to attorney William Leo Floodman, III from Clerk Re:Admission To Practice Law (MFG) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Nicole Washington.(MFG) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/6/2019) (MFG). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#10

(#10) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See Fed.R.Civ.P.12(h)(3). IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this action would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/23/2020. (TMT) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#6

(#6) SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Nicole Washington Sent To: Plaintiff (MFG) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

State Court File

1 #3

Original Filing Form

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Defendant Nicole Washington. (MFG) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See Fed.R.Civ.P.12(h)(3). IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this action would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/23/2020. (TMT) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See Fed.R.Civ.P.12(h)(3). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. A separate Order of Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/23/2020. (TMT) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall show cause within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order why this matter should not be remanded to the St. Louis County Circuit Court for lack jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's failure to respond to this Order in a timely manner will result in a dismissal of this action, without prejudice. (Show Cause Response due by 1/9/2020.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/19/2019. (TMT) (Main Document 8 replaced on 1/2/2020) (TMT). (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and FEDERAL STAY OF EVICTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C.A. 1446(D) by Defendant Nicole Washington (KCB) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (MFG) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter to attorney William Leo Floodman, III from Clerk Re:Admission To Practice Law (MFG) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Nicole Washington.(MFG) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/6/2019) (MFG). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Nicole Washington Sent To: Plaintiff (MFG) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Defendant Nicole Washington. (MFG) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Nicole Washington. (Attachments: #1 State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(MFG) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.