This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/28/2022 at 23:39:43 (UTC).

Glover Willie v. Pacifica Harborview-Kessler LLC

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Glover Willie filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Pacifica Harborview-Kessler LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam R Cummings. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01600

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam R Cummings

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stacy Glover Willie

Dallas, TX 75204

Defendant

Pacifica Harborview-Kessler LLC doing business as The Meridian at Kessler Park

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Theodore Carl Anderson, III

Attorney at Kilgore & Kilgore PLLC

3109 Carlisle, Suite 200

Dallas, TX 75204

D Elizabeth Masterson

Attorney at Kilgore & Kilgore PLLC

3109 Carlisle St, Suite 200

Dallas, TX 75204

Defendant Attorneys

Janice S Parker

Attorney at The Myers Law Group LLP

8144 Walnut Hill Lane, Suite 390

Dallas, TX 75231

Angella H Myers

Attorney at The Myers Law Group, LLP

14643 Dallas Parkway, Suite 550

Dallas, TX 75254

Sharon S Gilmore

Attorney at The Myers Law Group LLP

8144 Walnut Hill Lane, Suite 390

Dallas, TX 75231

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

1 #2

Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Pacifica Harborview-Kessler LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Persons)Attorney Angella H Myers added to party Pacifica Harborview-Kessler LLC(pty:dft) (Myers, Angella) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

9 #1

Certificate of Interested Persons

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/14/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 1/14/2022. Motions due by 9/15/2022. Deadline for Mediation on or before 9/15/2022. Discovery due by 12/12/2022. Trial set for 1/3/2023 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 9/20/2021) (axm) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/14/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 1/14/2022. Motions due by 9/15/2022. Deadline for Mediation on or before 9/15/2022. Discovery due by 12/12/2022. Trial set for 1/3/2023 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 9/20/2021) (axm) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pacifica Harborview-Kessler LLC. (See document #9 - 1 for image.) (jmg) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Pacifica Harborview-Kessler LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Persons)Attorney Angella H Myers added to party Pacifica Harborview-Kessler LLC(pty:dft) (Myers, Angella) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Pacifica Harborview-Kessler LLC. Waiver sent on 7/13/2021. (Anderson, Theodore) Modified text on 7/19/2021 (mla). (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Pacifica Harborview-Kessler LLC. Waiver sent on 7/13/2021. (Anderson, Theodore) Modified text on 7/19/2021 (mla). (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Pacifica Harborview-Kessler LLC. Waiver sent on 7/13/2021. (Anderson, Theodore) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Pacifica Harborview-Kessler LLC. (ykp) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Stacy Glover Willie. (Anderson, Theodore) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stacy Glover Willie. (Anderson, Theodore) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Pacifica Harborview-Kessler LLC filed by Stacy Glover Willie. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12036676) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet) (Anderson, Theodore) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFICA HARBORVIEW-KESSLER, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Janice Shelton Parker

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Angella H Myers