This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/01/2021 at 10:41:22 (UTC).

Glover v. Texas Instruments Inc

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Glover filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Texas Instruments Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara M. G. Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00442

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara M. G. Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terri Glover

Defendants

Texas Instruments, Inc.

Texas Instruments Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew R Scott

Attorney at Scott Law Firm PLLC

900 Jackson Street, Suite 550

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendant Attorneys

Robyn M Funk

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC

8117 Preston Road, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75225

Stephen E Hart

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart

500 Dallas, Suite 3000

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

8 #6

Exhibit(s) P's First Amended Petition

8 #5

Exhibit(s) D's Rule 91a Motion to Dismiss

8 #4

Exhibit(s) P's Original Petition

8 #3

Declaration(s) Declaration of Terri Glover

8 #2

Exhibit(s) EEOC right to file civil action

8 #1

Exhibit(s) Charge of Discrimination

#8

#7

#6

5 #3

Proposed Order

5 #2

Exhibit(s) 2

#5

#3

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 9/6/2022 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2021. Motions due by 5/6/2022. Fact and Expert Discovery due by 4/1/2022. Settlement Status Report due by 8/1/2021. Pretrial Order due by 8/16/2022. Pretrial Materials due by 8/16/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2022 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 4/15/2021) (axm) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Texas Instruments Inc. (Funk, Robyn) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/13/2021. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 3/23/2021) (hml) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY filed by Texas Instruments Inc re: #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Funk, Robyn) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint filed by Texas Instruments Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Funk, Robyn) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Terri Glover re: #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit(s) EEOC right to file civil action, #3 Declaration(s) Declaration of Terri Glover, #4 Exhibit(s) P's Original Petition, #5 Exhibit(s) D's Rule 91a Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit(s) P's First Amended Petition) (Scott, Matthew) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Terri Glover. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Scott, Matthew) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Appendix in Support filed by Texas Instruments, Inc. re #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Proposed Order) (Funk, Robyn) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ***PLEASE DISREGARD PER ATTORNEY, WILL REFILE*** Appendix in Support filed by Texas Instruments, Inc. re #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Proposed Order) (Funk, Robyn) Modified on 3/2/2021 (ndt). (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Texas Instruments, Inc. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Funk, Robyn) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Texas Instruments, Inc.. (Funk, Robyn) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Texas Instruments, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11654310) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Funk, Robyn) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Texas Instruments, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew R Scott