This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2022 at 12:41:16 (UTC).

Glover v. Praetorian Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 Glover filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Praetorian Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ed Kinkeade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01985

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ed Kinkeade

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tamika Glover

Defendant

Praetorian Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric B Dick

Attorney at Dick Law Firm, PLLC

3701 Brookwoods

Houston, TX 77092

Naval Hemendra Patel

Attorney at Patel Fuller, PLLC

1211 E. 15Th St.

Plano, TX 75074-6207

Defendant Attorneys

Jerrod Lee Rinehart

Attorney at Brackett & Ellis PC

100 Main Street

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Carter L Ferguson

Attorney at Brackett & Ellis PC

100 Main Street, Suite 100

Fort Worth, TX 76102-3090

Landon Young

Attorney at Brackett & Ellis, P.C.

100 Main Street

Fort Worth, TX 76102

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/1/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade. Deadline for mediation is on or before 2/24/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 3/6/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 3/6/2023. Discovery due by 10/6/2023. Motions due by 11/6/2023. Pretrial Order due by 3/11/2024. Pretrial Materials due by 3/11/2024. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/25/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#18

(#18) ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint, filed by Praetorian Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ferguson, Carter) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#16

(#16) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Praetorian Insurance Company filed by Tamika Glover. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Dick, Eric) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#15

(#15) RESPONSE filed by Tamika Glover re: #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Dick, Eric) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#14

(#14) STATUS REPORT Joint Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order Under Rule 26(f) of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Praetorian Insurance Company. (Ferguson, Carter) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures filed by Praetorian Insurance Company (Ferguson, Carter) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tamika Glover. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Dick, Eric) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

#11

(#11) Appendix in Support filed by Praetorian Insurance Company re #10 Amended Notice of Removal (Young, Landon) Modified docket text on 9/16/2022 (oyh). (Entered: 09/15/2022)

#10

(#10) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Praetorian Insurance Company (Young, Landon) Modified docket text on 9/16/2022 (oyh). (Entered: 09/15/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER: Federal courts are vested with subject-matter jurisdiction over all civil actions "arising under the Constitution, laws, or treaties of the United States," or where the case in controversy exceeds $75,000 and is between citizens of different states, or between citizens of a state and citizens or subjects of a foreign state. 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1332(a)(1)(2) (2012). Defendant is ORDERED to amend its Notice of Removal within ten (10) days from the date of this Order to properly allege Plaintiff's citizenship. Failure to do so will result in remand to state court without further notice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/14/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#8

(#8) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Praetorian Insurance Company (Young, Landon) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric B Dick for Naval Patel on behalf of Tamika Glover. (Dick, Eric) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/8/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mlb) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Praetorian Insurance Company. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Ferguson, Carter) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court filed by Praetorian Insurance Company (Ferguson, Carter) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit(s) Appendix in Support documents

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/1/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade. Deadline for mediation is on or before 2/24/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 3/6/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 3/6/2023. Discovery due by 10/6/2023. Motions due by 11/6/2023. Pretrial Order due by 3/11/2024. Pretrial Materials due by 3/11/2024. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/25/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint, filed by Praetorian Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ferguson, Carter) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • Docket(#17) ELECTRONIC ORDER Defendant's 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted (Doc. No. 8) is MOOT in light of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 16). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/6/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Praetorian Insurance Company filed by Tamika Glover. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Dick, Eric) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE filed by Tamika Glover re: #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Dick, Eric) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STATUS REPORT Joint Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order Under Rule 26(f) of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Praetorian Insurance Company. (Ferguson, Carter) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures filed by Praetorian Insurance Company (Ferguson, Carter) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tamika Glover. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Dick, Eric) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Appendix in Support filed by Praetorian Insurance Company re #10 Amended Notice of Removal (Young, Landon) Modified docket text on 9/16/2022 (oyh). (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Praetorian Insurance Company (Young, Landon) Modified docket text on 9/16/2022 (oyh). (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Federal courts are vested with subject-matter jurisdiction over all civil actions "arising under the Constitution, laws, or treaties of the United States," or where the case in controversy exceeds $75,000 and is between citizens of different states, or between citizens of a state and citizens or subjects of a foreign state. 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1332(a)(1)(2) (2012). Defendant is ORDERED to amend its Notice of Removal within ten (10) days from the date of this Order to properly allege Plaintiff's citizenship. Failure to do so will result in remand to state court without further notice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/14/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Praetorian Insurance Company (Young, Landon) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric B Dick for Naval Patel on behalf of Tamika Glover. (Dick, Eric) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/8/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, plaintiff Tamika Glover, shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/8/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mlb) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Praetorian Insurance Company. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Ferguson, Carter) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court filed by Praetorian Insurance Company (Ferguson, Carter) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Praetorian Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-13119275) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix in Support, #2 Exhibit(s) Appendix in Support documents) (Rinehart, Jerrod) Modified docket text on 9/8/2022 (mlb). (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Insurance Company B is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Landon Young

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carter L Ferguson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jerrod L Rinehart