This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/01/2021 at 07:13:38 (UTC).

Glover v. Oklahoma County of et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 Glover filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Oklahoma County of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David L. Russell and Shon T. Erwin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00294

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David L. Russell

Referral Judge

Shon T. Erwin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Natraun Glover

Oklahoma City, OK 73108

Defendants

KOCO TV Channel 5 News

David Prater

Oklahoma County of

Matthew Guy

Oklahoma City Police Department

P D Taylor

News 9

FOX 25 News

KFOR News 4

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Robert D Nelon

Attorney at Hall Estill-OKC

100 N Broadway Ave, Suite 2900

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Jon Epstein

Attorney at Hall Estill-OKC

100 N Broadway Ave, Suite 2900

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Desiree D Singer

Attorney at Attorney General's Ofc-NE 21STREET-OKC

313 Ne 21St St

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

Sherri R Katz

Attorney at Municipal Counselor's Office-OKC

200 N Walker Ave, Suite 400

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Mary K Goff

Attorney at Oklahoma City Municipal Counselor's Ofc-OKC

200 N Walker, Suite 400

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Stacey Haws Felkner

Attorney at Collins Zorn & Wagner PC

429 Ne 50Th St, 2Nd Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73105-1815

Ambre C Gooch

Attorney at Collins Zorn & Wagner PC

429 Ne 50Th St, 2Nd Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73105-1815

Carri A Remillard

Attorney at District Attorney's Ofc-OKC

320 Robert S Kerr Ave, Suite 505

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Rodney J Heggy

Attorney at Oklahoma County Courthouse

320 Robert S Kerr Ave, Suite 409

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Aaron C Etherington

Attorney at District Attorney's Ofc-OKC

320 Robert S Kerr Ave, Suite 505

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

S Douglas Dodd

Attorney at Doerner Saunders Daniel & Anderson-TULSA

Two W 2Nd Street, Suite 700

Tulsa, OK 74103-3117

 

Court Documents

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#2

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Summons Return - OKC

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Summons Return - Prater

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Summons Return - OKC Police Department

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Summons Return - Sheriff PD Taylor

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Petition

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet

#1

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 4/20/21. (jw) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by News 9 . (Dodd, S) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by KOCO TV Channel 5 News . (Nelon, Robert) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by KFOR News 4 . (Nelon, Robert) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by KFOR News 4 . (Nelon, Robert) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum Brief in Support by News 9. (Dodd, S) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ENTRY of Appearance by S Douglas Dodd on behalf of News 9 (Dodd, S) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ENTRY of Appearance by Jon Epstein on behalf of KOCO TV Channel 5 News (Epstein, Jon) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ENTRY of Appearance by Jon Epstein on behalf of KFOR News 4 (Epstein, Jon) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STRICKEN ENTRY of Appearance by Robert D Nelon on behalf of KOCO TV Channel 5 News (Nelon, Robert) Modified on 4/9/2021 (kmt). (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE (other) by P D Taylor re #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Notice (other), Consent to Removal (Heggy, Rodney) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Carri A Remillard on behalf of P D Taylor (Remillard, Carri) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Aaron C Etherington on behalf of P D Taylor (Etherington, Aaron) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by P D Taylor. (Heggy, Rodney) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Rodney J Heggy on behalf of P D Taylor (Heggy, Rodney) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE (other) by Matthew Guy re #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Notice and Petition of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons Return-Taylor, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons Return-OKC PD, #5 Exhibit 5 - Summons Return-Prater, #6 Exhibit 6 - Summons Return - OKC, #7 Exhibit 7 - Summons Return-Guy)(Felkner, Stacey) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Ambre C Gooch on behalf of Matthew Guy (Gooch, Ambre) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Stacey Haws Felkner on behalf of Matthew Guy (Felkner, Stacey) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3655762. (Felkner, Stacey) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2021-59 filed by Matthew Guy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons Return - Sheriff PD Taylor, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons Return - OKC Police Department, #5 Exhibit 5 - Summons Return - Prater, #6 Exhibit 6 - Summons Return - OKC, #7 Exhibit 7 - Summons Return - Matthew Guy, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OKLAHOMA CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen D. Dodd

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert D Nelon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rodney J Heggy