This case was last updated from PACER on 08/20/2019 at 08:14:55 (UTC).

Glover v. Brewer et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 Glover filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Brewer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Bristow Marchant and Margaret B Seymour. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:19-CV-01770

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Bristow Marchant

Presiding Judge

Margaret B Seymour

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tekoa Tobias Glover

Spartanburg, SC 29303

Defendants

Hollister

Lt Freeman

Sgt. Norris

Dir. Bodiford

Chuck Wright

T Medueder

Major Freeman

Lt. McCombs

Josev Brewer

Mjr. Stowers

C Hayes

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant. It is recommended that the Court deny Plaintiff's motions for class certification (ECF No. 18) and to join class (ECF No. 20). Objections to R&R due by 8/20/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 08/06/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#25

(#25) REFERENCE #24 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #10 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying #21 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 08/06/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#24

(#24) PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 8/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 08/06/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#21

(#21) Second MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Tekoa Tobias Glover. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)No proposed order. Motions referred to Bristow Marchant. (egra, ) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

20 #2

Envelope

20 #1

Cover Letter

#20

(#20) MOTION to Join Class by Tekoa Tobias Glover. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) No proposed order. Motions referred to Bristow Marchant. (egra, ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

18 #1

Envelope

#18

(#18) MOTION for Class Certification by Tekoa Tobias Glover. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) No proposed order. Motions referred to Bristow Marchant. (egra, ) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

3 #3

Envelope

3 #2

Memorandun in Support

3 #1

Declaration in Support

#3

(#25) REFERENCE #24 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #10 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying #21 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 08/06/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Supporting Documents

1 #1

Cover Letter

#1

(#10) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Tekoa Tobias Glover. Response to Motion due by 8/1/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Amended complaint, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) Motions referred to Bristow Marchant. (egra, ) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #18 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Tekoa Tobias Glover, #20 MOTION to Join Class filed by Tekoa Tobias Glover, #24 Proper Form Order, #25 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, with required documents placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Tekoa Tobias Glover 271546 Spartanburg County Detention Center 950 California Avenue Spartanburg, SC 29303 (egra, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant. It is recommended that the Court deny Plaintiff's motions for class certification (ECF No. 18) and to join class (ECF No. 20). Objections to R&R due by 8/20/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 08/06/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) REFERENCE #24 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #10 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying #21 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 08/06/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 8/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 08/06/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Second MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Tekoa Tobias Glover. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)No proposed order. Motions referred to Bristow Marchant. (egra, ) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION to Join Class by Tekoa Tobias Glover. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) No proposed order. Motions referred to Bristow Marchant. (egra, ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Addressee: Tekoa Tobias Glover. Document Returned: 13 Document Mailed. (egra, ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION for Class Certification by Tekoa Tobias Glover. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) No proposed order. Motions referred to Bristow Marchant. (egra, ) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Letter from Tekoa Glover. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (egra, ) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • (#13) ***DOCUMENT MAILED - Docket Sheet per request outlined in cover letter and procedure for discovery placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Tekoa Tobias Glover 271546 Spartanburg County Detention Center 950 California Avenue Spartanburg, SC 29303 (egra, ) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Plaintiff's Interrogatories and request for production of documents by Tekoa Tobias Glover. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (egra, ) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Tekoa Tobias Glover. Response to Motion due by 8/1/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Amended complaint, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) Motions referred to Bristow Marchant. (egra, ) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ***DOCUMENT MAILED Docket sheet and new complaint form per #8 Letter placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Tekoa Tobias Glover 271546 Spartanburg County Detention Center 950 California Avenue Spartanburg, SC 29303 (egra, ) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Letter from Tekoa Glover. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Envelope) (egra, ) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • (#7) ***DOCUMENT MAILED 6 Case Reassigned placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Tekoa Tobias Glover, #271546, Spartanburg County Detention Center, 950 California Avenue, Spartanburg, SC 29303 (bshr, ) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • (#6) Case Reassigned to Honorable Margaret B. Seymour. Honorable Timothy M. Cain no longer assigned to the case. (bshr, ) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • (#4) TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Spartanburg. (hada, ) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Tekoa Tobias Glover. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Memorandun in Support, #3 Envelope)Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(hada, ) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Tekoa Tobias Glover. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(hada, ) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Dir. Bodiford, Josev Brewer, Freeman, Major Freeman, C Hayes, Hollister, Lt. McCombs, T Medueder, Sgt. Norris, Mjr. Stowers, Chuck Wright, filed by Tekoa Tobias Glover. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Supporting Documents, #3 Envelope)(hada, ) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLLISTER CO. is a litigant