This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:22:32 (UTC).

Glover et al v. Rivas et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Glover filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Rivas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terrence G. Berg and Michael J. Hluchaniuk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-13406

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence G. Berg

Referral Judge

Michael J. Hluchaniuk

 

Party Details

Defendants

Michael Kennedy

Stacey Purdy

Nurse Bills

Linnie Brooks

Ne'tesha Demyers

Gordon Hill

Nicole Pitcher

Joel Salinas

William Marsh

Kevin Lindsey

Jeffrey Utter

Officer Snyder

Jeremy Howard

Jennifer Norder

Vincent Rickman

Jennifer Sierminski

Monica Rivas

Christine McCumber-Hemry

Valerie Lashley

Ale Schneider

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

James T. Farrell

Attorney at Michigan Department of Attorney General

P.O. Box 30217, 525 W. Ottawa St.

Lansing, MI 48909

Other Attorneys

Solomon M. Radner

Attorney at EXCOLO LAW, PLLC

26700 Lahser Rd, Suite 401

Southfield, MI 48033

 

Court Documents

3 #21

Document Continuation

4 #3

Document Continuation

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Sheryl Bailey served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019; Nurse Bills served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; Victoria Hallet served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; Ale Schneider served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; Douglas Smith served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation, #3 Document Continuation, #4 Document Continuation) (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

3 #2

Document Continuation

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Paul Anderson, Sheryl Bailey, Shawn Brewer, Crystal Brown, Jay Cooley, Jennifer Crane, Samuel Delossantos, Michael Demps, Britancia Doss, Devin Freymuth, Gordon Hill, Jeremy Howard, Joseph Iosefa, Michael Kennedy, Nicholas Kik, James King, Chris Knapp, Valerie Lashley, Brian Madery, William Marsh, Christine McCumber-Hemry, Tarhaka McElroy, Marvin Moseley, Keara Muzzin, Noah Nagy, Kimberly Napier, Jennifer Norder, Ernest Pazitka, Stacey Purdy, Shane Rennells, Sergeant Reynolds, Vincent Rickman, Patricia Rogers, Joel Salinas, Officer Snyder, Jacquelyn Thelen. (Farrell, James) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

4 #2

Document Continuation

7 #1

Exhibit 1 - Email chain

4 #4

Document Continuation

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Paul Anderson served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Shawn Brewer served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Linnie Brooks served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Crystal Brown served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Jay Cooley served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Jennifer Crane served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Samuel Delossantos served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Michael Demps served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Ne'tesha Demyers served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Britancia Doss served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Devin Freymuth served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Gordon Hill served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; William Hokanson served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Jeremy Howard served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Joseph Iosefa served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Michael Kennedy served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Nicholas Kik served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; James King served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Chris Knapp served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Valerie Lashley served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Brian Madery served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; William Marsh served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Christine McCumber-Hemry served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Tarhaka McElroy served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Marvin Moseley served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Keara Muzzin served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Noah Nagy served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Kimberly Napier served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Jennifer Norder served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Ernest Pazitka served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Stacey Purdy served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Shane Rennells served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Sergeant Reynolds served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Monica Rivas served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Patricia Rogers served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Joel Salinas served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Jennifer Sierminski served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Officer Snyder served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Jacquelyn Thelen served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation, #3 Document Continuation, #4 Document Continuation, #5 Document Continuation, #6 Document Continuation, #7 Document Continuation, #8 Document Continuation, #9 Document Continuation, #10 Document Continuation, #11 Document Continuation, #12 Document Continuation, #13 Document Continuation, #14 Document Continuation, #15 Document Continuation, #16 Document Continuation, #17 Document Continuation, #18 Document Continuation, #19 Document Continuation, #20 Document Continuation, #21 Document Continuation, #22 Document Continuation, #23 Document Continuation, #24 Document Continuation, #25 Document Continuation, #26 Document Continuation, #27 Document Continuation, #28 Document Continuation, #29 Document Continuation, #30 Document Continuation, #31 Document Continuation, #32 Document Continuation, #33 Document Continuation, #34 Document Continuation, #35 Document Continuation, #36 Document Continuation, #37 Document Continuation, #38 Document Continuation) (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

3 #3

Document Continuation

9 #1

Document Continuation Return of Service for Jeffrey Utter

3 #1

Document Continuation

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jennifer Norder served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; Jeffrey Utter served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Return of Service for Jeffrey Utter) (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Tina Glover, Richard Glover, R. G. against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7491439 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Jackson - County Where Action Arose: Jackson - County of 1st Defendant: Jackson. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE to #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email chain) (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

4 #1

Document Continuation

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Miscellaneous Hearing set for 1/22/2020 10:30 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Nicole Pitcher served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jennifer Norder served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; Jeffrey Utter served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Return of Service for Jeffrey Utter) (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Miscellaneous Hearing set for 1/22/2020 10:30 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE to #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email chain) (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Nicole Pitcher served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Paul Anderson, Sheryl Bailey, Shawn Brewer, Crystal Brown, Jay Cooley, Jennifer Crane, Samuel Delossantos, Michael Demps, Britancia Doss, Devin Freymuth, Gordon Hill, Jeremy Howard, Joseph Iosefa, Michael Kennedy, Nicholas Kik, James King, Chris Knapp, Valerie Lashley, Brian Madery, William Marsh, Christine McCumber-Hemry, Tarhaka McElroy, Marvin Moseley, Keara Muzzin, Noah Nagy, Kimberly Napier, Jennifer Norder, Ernest Pazitka, Stacey Purdy, Shane Rennells, Sergeant Reynolds, Vincent Rickman, Patricia Rogers, Joel Salinas, Officer Snyder, Jacquelyn Thelen. (Farrell, James) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Sheryl Bailey served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019; Nurse Bills served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; Victoria Hallet served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; Ale Schneider served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; Douglas Smith served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation, #3 Document Continuation, #4 Document Continuation) (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Paul Anderson served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Shawn Brewer served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Linnie Brooks served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Crystal Brown served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Jay Cooley served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Jennifer Crane served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Samuel Delossantos served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Michael Demps served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Ne'tesha Demyers served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Britancia Doss served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Devin Freymuth served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Gordon Hill served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; William Hokanson served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Jeremy Howard served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Joseph Iosefa served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Michael Kennedy served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Nicholas Kik served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; James King served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Chris Knapp served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Valerie Lashley served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Brian Madery served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; William Marsh served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Christine McCumber-Hemry served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Tarhaka McElroy served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Marvin Moseley served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Keara Muzzin served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Noah Nagy served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Kimberly Napier served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Jennifer Norder served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Ernest Pazitka served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Stacey Purdy served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Shane Rennells served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Sergeant Reynolds served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Monica Rivas served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Patricia Rogers served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Joel Salinas served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Jennifer Sierminski served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Officer Snyder served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Jacquelyn Thelen served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation, #3 Document Continuation, #4 Document Continuation, #5 Document Continuation, #6 Document Continuation, #7 Document Continuation, #8 Document Continuation, #9 Document Continuation, #10 Document Continuation, #11 Document Continuation, #12 Document Continuation, #13 Document Continuation, #14 Document Continuation, #15 Document Continuation, #16 Document Continuation, #17 Document Continuation, #18 Document Continuation, #19 Document Continuation, #20 Document Continuation, #21 Document Continuation, #22 Document Continuation, #23 Document Continuation, #24 Document Continuation, #25 Document Continuation, #26 Document Continuation, #27 Document Continuation, #28 Document Continuation, #29 Document Continuation, #30 Document Continuation, #31 Document Continuation, #32 Document Continuation, #33 Document Continuation, #34 Document Continuation, #35 Document Continuation, #36 Document Continuation, #37 Document Continuation, #38 Document Continuation) (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Paul Anderson, Sheryl Bailey, Nurse Bills, Karina Blair, Shawn Brewer, Linnie Brooks, Crystal Brown, Jay Cooley, Jennifer Crane, Samuel Delossantos, Michael Demps, Ne'tesha Demyers, Britancia Doss, Devin Freymuth, Gregory Gordon, Victoria Hallet, Gordon Hill, William Hokanson, Jeremy Howard, Joseph Iosefa, Michael Kennedy, Nicholas Kik, James King, Chris Knapp, Valerie Lashley, Kevin Lindsey, Brian Madery, William Marsh, Christine McCumber-Hemry, Tarhaka McElroy, Marvin Moseley, Keara Muzzin, Noah Nagy, Kimberly Napier, Khris Nevins, Jennifer Norder, Ernest Pazitka, Nicole Pitcher, Stacey Purdy, Shane Rennells, Sergeant Reynolds, Vincent Rickman, Monica Rivas, Patricia Rogers, Joel Salinas, Ale Schneider, Jennifer Sierminski, Douglas Smith, Officer Snyder, Jacquelyn Thelen, Jeffrey Utter* (DAll) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Tina Glover, Richard Glover, R. G. against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7491439 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Jackson - County Where Action Arose: Jackson - County of 1st Defendant: Jackson. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less