This case was last updated from PACER on 11/02/2019 at 07:12:33 (UTC).

Globys, Inc. v. Sorriso Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 Globys, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Sorriso Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11867

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Globys, Inc.

Defendant

Sorriso Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Laura L. Carroll

Attorney at Burns & Levinson LLP

125 High Street

Boston, MA 02110

Eric G.J. Kaviar

Attorney at Burns & Levinson LLP

125 High Street

Boston, MA 02110

David K. Tellekson

Attorney at Merchant & Gould, P.C.

1191 Second Avenue, Suite 1500

Seattle, WA 98101-3342

Jonathan T. McMichael

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

1191 Second Avenue, 10Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant Attorneys

Catherine I. Rajwani

Attorney at The Harbor Law Group

300 West Main Street, Building A, Unit 1

Northborough, MA 01532

Herling David Romero Adrianza

Attorney at Harbor Law Group

300 W Main Street, Building A, Unit 1

Marlborough, MA 01532

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Globys, Inc.. (Carroll, Laura) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B: US Pat. No. 7774271

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet

#2

(#2) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Carroll, Laura) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#1

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sorriso Technologies, Inc..(Rajwani, Catherine) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#21

(#21) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Rajwani, Catherine) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#15

(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sorriso Technologies, Inc.. (Rajwani, Catherine) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Sorriso Technologies, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#22

(#22) Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered re #19 JOINT STATEMENT is so ordered as modifed as the ase management scheduling order. DISCOVERY DUE August 4, 2020 and DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE August 21, 2020. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit C: US Pat. No. 8930252

#20

(#20) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Tellekson, David) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#19

(#19) JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Tellekson, David) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric G.J. Kaviar on behalf of Globys, Inc. (Kaviar, Eric) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sorriso Technologies, Inc..(Rajwani, Catherine) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Herling David Romero Adrianza on behalf of Sorriso Technologies, Inc. (Romero Adrianza, Herling) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A: US Pat. No. 7996310

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Rajwani, Catherine) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered re #19 JOINT STATEMENT is so ordered as modifed as the ase management scheduling order. DISCOVERY DUE August 4, 2020 and DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE August 21, 2020. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Tellekson, David) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Tellekson, David) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric G.J. Kaviar on behalf of Globys, Inc. (Kaviar, Eric) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Herling David Romero Adrianza on behalf of Sorriso Technologies, Inc. (Romero Adrianza, Herling) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sorriso Technologies, Inc.. (Rajwani, Catherine) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sorriso Technologies, Inc..(Rajwani, Catherine) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added David K. Tellekson and Jonathan T. McMichael . Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew) (Modified on 10/10/2019 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Carroll, Laura) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Sorriso Technologies, Inc. answer due 10/11/2019. (DLC, law3) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to October 11, 2019 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Globys, Inc..(Carroll, Laura) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Globys, Inc.. Sorriso Technologies, Inc. served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Globys, Inc.. (Carroll, Laura) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David K. Tellekson, Jonathan T. McMichael Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7867229 by Globys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of David K. Tellekson, #2 Affidavit Certification of Jonathan T. McMichael)(Carroll, Laura) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Sorriso Technologies, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Globys, Inc.. (Carroll, Laura) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Carroll, Laura) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Sorriso Technologies, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7859014 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Globys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: US Pat. No. 7996310, #2 Exhibit B: US Pat. No. 7774271, #3 Exhibit C: US Pat. No. 8930252, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet)(Carroll, Laura) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.