This case was last updated from PACER on 09/01/2019 at 07:47:11 (UTC).

Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company v. Chisholm et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Chisholm. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William T. Moore, Jr and Christopher L. Ray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00158

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William T. Moore, Jr

Referral Judge

Christopher L. Ray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company

Defendants

Phillip Chisholm

Chester Jenkins

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenton J. Coppage

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

1180 West Peachtree Street, Nw, Suite 2300

Atlanta, GA 30309-3482

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Summons Submitted (Coppage, Kenton) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company. Phillip Chisholm waiver sent on 7/3/2019, answer due 9/1/2019. (Coppage, Kenton) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company. (jrb) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jrb) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Chester Jenkins. (evk) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Chester Jenkins. (evk) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Submitted (Coppage, Kenton) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company. Phillip Chisholm waiver sent on 7/3/2019, answer due 9/1/2019. (Coppage, Kenton) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • (#3) Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (evk) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company. (jrb) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jrb) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.