This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2020 at 08:33:09 (UTC).

Globalex, Inc. v. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 Globalex, Inc filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jed S. Rakoff. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-08874

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jed S. Rakoff

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Globalex, Inc.

Defendant

MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Justin Matthew Heilig

Attorney at Hill Rivkins LLP

45 Broadway, Suite 1500

Ny, NY 10006

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/11/2020 ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE at 11:15 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/2/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. waiver sent on 11/23/2020, answer due 1/22/2021. Document filed by Globalex, Inc...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(jgo) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Globalex, Inc...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Globalex, Inc...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22284162)Document filed by Globalex, Inc...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 12/2/2020, ( Initial telephonic Conference set for 1/26/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.)The dial in information for the public remains as previously posted.. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/11/2020 ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE at 11:15 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/2/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. waiver sent on 11/23/2020, answer due 1/22/2021. Document filed by Globalex, Inc...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(jgo) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Globalex, Inc...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Globalex, Inc...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22284162)Document filed by Globalex, Inc...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less