This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/29/2019 at 09:10:03 (UTC).

Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC v. Stewart

Case Summary

On 10/30/2019 Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Stewart. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy Joseph and Lynn Adelman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01600

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Nancy Joseph

Lynn Adelman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC

Defendants

Robert D. Stewart

Robert D Stewart

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Seth Wamelink

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

950 Main Ave - Ste 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

John Q Lewis

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

950 Main Ave - Ste 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

Defendant Attorney

Brooks Harlow

Attorney at Lukas Nace Gutierrez & Sachs Chartered

1650 Tysons Blvd - Ste 1500

Mclean, VA 22102

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibits A - F

1 #2

Summons Walworth, WI Address

1 #3

Summons Fontana-On-Geneva Lake, WI Address

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER Granting #10 Leave to File Amended Complaint signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/19/19. (cc: all counsel)(jad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) with Jury Demand against Robert D Stewart filed by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC.(Wamelink, Seth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC. (Wamelink, Seth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks Harlow on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Brooks E. Harlow (Harlow, Brooks)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/2/19 granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (cc: all counsel) (jad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #8 Unopposed MOTION for Order (Proposed) Extending Defendant's Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC, #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC ; Proposed Orders should be e-filed as an attachment to the stipulation or motion and NOT e-filed as a separate document. Please ensure that the proposed order has been emailed to the proposed email box for the assigned judge in Word or WordPerfect format. This document does not need to be re-filedThe incorrect event was chosen; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (bx)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROPOSED ORDER Unopposed MOTION for Order Extending Defendant's Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC. (Wamelink, Seth) Modified on 12/2/2019 (bx).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC. (Wamelink, Seth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC. Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC served on 11/7/2019. (Wamelink, Seth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (blr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Wamelink, Seth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE Statement by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC. (Wamelink, Seth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Robert D Stewart (two locations). (ds)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC (Wamelink, Seth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC (Wamelink, Seth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketCase Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The attached summons was not saved in a fillable format and cannot be issued electronically. Please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. ; Please refer to the # summons instructions for further guidance. (ds)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Robert D. Stewart by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3264003) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - F, #2 Summons Walworth, WI Address, #3 Summons Fontana-On-Geneva Lake, WI Address, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wamelink, Seth)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Global Signal Acquisitions IV LLC is a litigant