This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 05:20:34 (UTC).

Global Realty Management Inc. v. Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Global Realty Management Inc filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony J Trenga and John F. Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01459

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anthony J Trenga

Referral Judge

John F. Anderson

 

Party Details

Appellant and Debtor

Global Realty Management Inc.

42414 Chamois Ct.

Arcola, VA 20166

Appellees

Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB

Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB doing business as Christiana Trust as Owner Trustee of the Residential Credit Opportunities

Interested Party

USBC-Alexandria (United States Bankruptcy Court)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorneys

Samuel I. White

Attorney at Samuel I. White PC

8550 Mayland Dr, Suite 202

Richmond, VA 23294-4704

Brandon Ryan Jordan

Attorney at Samuel I. White PC (Richmond)

1804 Staples Mill Rd, Suite 200

Richmond, VA 23230

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Waiver of re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution with Roseboro,. Waiver of Oral Argument by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (Jordan, Brandon) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Jordan, Brandon) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution with Roseboro,. by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Jordan, Brandon) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#3

(#3) Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Appellant Brief due by 1/6/2020. (acha, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

2 #3

Order

2 #2

Notice

2 #1

Bankruptcy Record

#2

(#2) Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Record, #2 Notice, #3 Order)(acha, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #1

Bankruptcy Transmittal

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-12812-KHK. File received, filed by Global Realty Management Inc.. Appellant Brief due by 12/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Transmittal)(acha, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Waiver of re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution with Roseboro,. Waiver of Oral Argument by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (Jordan, Brandon) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution with Roseboro,. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (acha, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Jordan, Brandon) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution with Roseboro,. by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Jordan, Brandon) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Appellant Brief due by 1/6/2020. (acha, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Record, #2 Notice, #3 Order)(acha, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-12812-KHK. File received, filed by Global Realty Management Inc.. Appellant Brief due by 12/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Transmittal)(acha, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less