This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/18/2021 at 13:29:10 (UTC).

Global Plasma Solutions Inc v. D Zine Partners LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 Global Plasma Solutions Inc filed an Other lawsuit against D Zine Partners LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sidney A Fitzwater and Barbara M. G. Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00884

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sidney A Fitzwater

Barbara M. G. Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Global Plasma Solutions Inc

Defendants

D Zine Partners LLC

Marwa Zaatari

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew William Cornelia

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

2000 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1400

Dallas, TX 75201

Justin R Opitz

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

2000 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1400

Dallas, TX 75201

Lucy Jewett Wheatley

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Robert A Muckenfuss

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP

201 N Tryon Street, Suite 3000

Charlotte, NC 28202

Kelly A Warlich

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP

201 N Tryon Street, Suite 3000

Charlotte, NC 28202

Defendant Attorneys

Brett Bonner Stalcup

Attorney at Law Offices of Brett Stalcup

3615 N. Hall Street

Dallas, TX 75219

Paul Martin Sullivan

Attorney at The Law Office of Paul M Sullivan PLLC

5111 Center St

Houston, TX 77007

Michael Martin Essmyer

Attorney at The Essmyer Law Firm

5111 Center St

Houston, TX 77007

 

Court Documents

#30

#29

#28

27 #1

Proposed Order

#27

26 #1

Proposed Order

#26

22 #1

Proposed Order

#22

1 #13

Exhibit L

1 #11

Exhibit J

1 #10

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Bonner Stalcup on behalf of D Zine Partners LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Stalcup, Brett) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER: Defendants' Verified Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief [ECF No. #22 ] and their request for a hearing are DENIED. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 6/10/2021) (ctf) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Appendix in Support filed by Global Plasma Solutions Inc re: #27 Response/Objection. (Opitz, Justin) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) RESPONSE filed by Global Plasma Solutions Inc re: #22 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Opitz, Justin) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Second Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by D Zine Partners LLC, Marwa Zaatari. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Essmyer, Michael) Modified text on 6/8/2021 (mjr). (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Joint Submission on Discovery Matters by Global Plasma Solutions Inc. (Opitz, Justin) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER re: #22 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief, #23 Appendix in Support. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file its responses due by 6/4/2021. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 5/26/2021) (mjr) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketChief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn reassigned as presiding judge per Special Order 3-339. Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater no longer assigned to case. (ctf) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Appendix in Support filed by D Zine Partners LLC, Marwa Zaatari re: #22 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief. (Essmyer, Michael) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief filed by D Zine Partners LLC, Marwa Zaatari (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Essmyer, Michael) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert A. Muckenfuss. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/29/2021) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Robert A. Muckenfuss (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11850047) filed by Global Plasma Solutions Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Opitz, Justin) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Marwa Zaatari; served on 4/21/2021. (Opitz, Justin) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lucy Jewett Wheatley. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/26/2021) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to D Zine Partners LLC; served on 4/22/2021. (Opitz, Justin) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Lucy Jewett Wheatley (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11836097) filed by Global Plasma Solutions Inc (Opitz, Justin) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ***DISREGARD/FILED IN ERROR***Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (jmg) Modified on 4/21/2021 (ykp). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to D Zine Partners LLC, Marwa Zaatari. (axm) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Global Plasma Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11809711) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L) (Opitz, Justin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/19/2021 to flatten pdf) (axm). (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Global Plasma Solutions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin R Opitz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lucy J Wheatley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew William Cornelia