This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2021 at 09:00:26 (UTC).

GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC v. GRUNZWEIG

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GRUNZWEIG. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is CLAY D LAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00047

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CLAY D LAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC

Defendant

JEREMY GRUNZWEIG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathan David Chapman

171 17Th Street Nw, Suite 1550

Atlanta, GA 30363

ANDREW M SWINDLE

171 17Th St Nw Ste 1550

Atlanta, GA 30363

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC as to JEREMY GRUNZWEIG(Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#4

(#4) Jurisdictional Statement by GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC (Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC identifying Other Affiliate CAYAN LLC, Other Affiliate COMERICA GLOBAL PAYMENTS ENTIDAD DE PAGO S.L., Other Affiliate GLOBAL PAYMENTS DIRECT INC., Other Affiliate GLOBAL PAYMENTS GAMING SERVICES INC., Other Affiliate GPUK LLP, Other Affiliate HEARTLAND PAYMENT SYSTEMS LLC, Other Affiliate NETSPEND CORPORATION, Other Affiliate TSYS LLC, Other Affiliate TSYS MERCHANT SOLUTIONS INC. for GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC. (Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons issued as to JEREMY GRUNZWEIG (tlf). (Entered: 04/02/2021)

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F - 2020 Restricted Stock Certificate II

1 #5

Exhibit E - 2020 Restricted Stock Certificate I

1 #4

Exhibit D - 2019 Restricted Stock Certificate

1 #3

Exhibit C - 2018 Restricted Stock Certificate

1 #2

Exhibit B - 2017 Restricted Stock Certificate

1 #1

Exhibit A - Offer Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JEREMY GRUNZWEIG Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3757292, $402 filed by GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Offer Letter, #2 Exhibit B - 2017 Restricted Stock Certificate, #3 Exhibit C - 2018 Restricted Stock Certificate, #4 Exhibit D - 2019 Restricted Stock Certificate, #5 Exhibit E - 2020 Restricted Stock Certificate I, #6 Exhibit F - 2020 Restricted Stock Certificate II, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons)(Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREMARK: In light of #5 Notice of Dismissal, this case has been closed (tlf). (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC as to JEREMY GRUNZWEIG(Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketGeorgia Attorney Admission Fee Met by ANDREW M SWINDLE (nop) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Jurisdictional Statement by GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC (Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC identifying Other Affiliate CAYAN LLC, Other Affiliate COMERICA GLOBAL PAYMENTS ENTIDAD DE PAGO S.L., Other Affiliate GLOBAL PAYMENTS DIRECT INC., Other Affiliate GLOBAL PAYMENTS GAMING SERVICES INC., Other Affiliate GPUK LLP, Other Affiliate HEARTLAND PAYMENT SYSTEMS LLC, Other Affiliate NETSPEND CORPORATION, Other Affiliate TSYS LLC, Other Affiliate TSYS MERCHANT SOLUTIONS INC. for GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC. (Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons issued as to JEREMY GRUNZWEIG (tlf). (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Complaint filed by GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately and pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed (tlf). (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Complaint filed by GLOBAL PAYMENTS, INC.; Notice to Counsel: Nathan Chapman. The telephone number on the aforementioned document does not match the information in CM/ECF. Please update your contact information via PACER (tlf). (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL ANDREW M SWINDLE - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing may be scheduled (tlf). (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JEREMY GRUNZWEIG Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3757292, $402 filed by GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Offer Letter, #2 Exhibit B - 2017 Restricted Stock Certificate, #3 Exhibit C - 2018 Restricted Stock Certificate, #4 Exhibit D - 2019 Restricted Stock Certificate, #5 Exhibit E - 2020 Restricted Stock Certificate I, #6 Exhibit F - 2020 Restricted Stock Certificate II, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons)(Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Global Payments Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan David Chapman