This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/22/2022 at 04:30:22 (UTC).

Global Locating Systems LLC v. Coolpad Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 Global Locating Systems LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Coolpad Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeremy D. Kernodle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00461

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeremy D. Kernodle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Global Locating Systems LLC

Defendant

Coolpad Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Louis M. Heidelberger

Brian Paul Herrmann

Shawn A. Latchford

Edward R Nelson, III

Defendant Attorneys

Jason Liang Xu

Jeffrey Lance Johnson

Yufeng Ma

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (gsg) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#20

(#20) FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 12/22/2020. (gsg) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#19

(#19) ORDER GRANTING #18 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Global Locating Systems LLC. ORDERED that this action and all claims herein are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 12/22/2020. (gsg) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

18 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#18

(#18) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) - Without Prejudice by Global Locating Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Stay. The Court ORDERS all proceedings and deadlines to be stayed for thirty (30) days. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 11/24/2020. (efarris, ) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#16

(#16) Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Coolpad Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Yufeng Ma on behalf of Coolpad Technologies, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8108107. (Ma, Yufeng) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (gsg) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 12/22/2020. (gsg) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER GRANTING #18 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Global Locating Systems LLC. ORDERED that this action and all claims herein are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 12/22/2020. (gsg) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) - Without Prejudice by Global Locating Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Stay. The Court ORDERS all proceedings and deadlines to be stayed for thirty (30) days. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 11/24/2020. (efarris, ) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Coolpad Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Yufeng Ma on behalf of Coolpad Technologies, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8108107. (Ma, Yufeng) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement. Defendants deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint for Patent Infringement is extended to November 25, 2020. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 11/9/2020. (efarris, ) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement by Coolpad Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant's deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until and including 11-10-2020. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 10/7/2020. (efarris, ) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Louis M. Heidelberger on behalf of Global Locating Systems LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7963473. (Heidelberger, Louis) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketDistrict Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Global Locating Systems LLC. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Coolpad Technologies, Inc.. (ndc) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn A. Latchford on behalf of Global Locating Systems LLC (Latchford, Shawn) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Paul Herrmann on behalf of Global Locating Systems LLC (Herrmann, Brian) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Global Locating Systems LLC (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Coolpad Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7958830.), filed by Global Locating Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less