This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/25/2019 at 08:04:24 (UTC).

Global Locating Services Intellectual Property LLC v. Digital Matter Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/26/2019 Global Locating Services Intellectual Property LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Digital Matter Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy C. Batten, Sr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02927

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy C. Batten, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Global Locating Services Intellectual Property LLC

Defendant

Digital Matter Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Louis M. Heidelberger

Attorney at The Law Office of Louis M. Heidelberger. ESQ, LLC

1229 Laurel Oak Lane

York, PA 17403

David Ludwig

Attorney at Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig, PLLC

211 Church Street Se

Leesburg, VA 20175

Geoffrey Michael Dureska

Attorney at Dunlap, Bennett & Ludwig, PLLC

1870 The Exchange, Se, Ste 200

Atlanta, GA 30339

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) AO Form 120 with Decision/Judgment forwarded to Commissioner. (usw) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#5

(#5) VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Global Locating Services Intellectual Property LLC. (Dureska, Geoffrey) Modified on 8/14/2019 to correct event type(usw). (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#4

(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Digital Matter Inc. (bnw) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Global Locating Services Intellectual Property LLC identifying Other Affiliate Cerinet USA, Inc., Other Affiliate Global Locating Systems, LTD. for Global Locating Services Intellectual Property LLC by Global Locating Services Intellectual Property LLC.(bnw) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

2 #1

Corrected AO

#2

(#2) AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (bnw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2019: #1 Corrected AO) (bnw). (Entered: 06/28/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Global Locating Services Intellectual Property LLC.(Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8756493) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/28/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office re #6 A.O. Form 120. (usw) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AO Form 120 with Decision/Judgment forwarded to Commissioner. (usw) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Civil Case Terminated. (usw) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #5 Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (usw) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Global Locating Services Intellectual Property LLC. (Dureska, Geoffrey) Modified on 8/14/2019 to correct event type(usw). (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Digital Matter Inc. (bnw) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Global Locating Services Intellectual Property LLC identifying Other Affiliate Cerinet USA, Inc., Other Affiliate Global Locating Systems, LTD. for Global Locating Services Intellectual Property LLC by Global Locating Services Intellectual Property LLC.(bnw) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (bnw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2019: #1 Corrected AO) (bnw). (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Global Locating Services Intellectual Property LLC.(Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8756493) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less