Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/26/2020 at 08:08:31 (UTC).

Global Hemp, Inc. v. Industrial Hemp Solutions, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 Global Hemp, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Industrial Hemp Solutions, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas B. Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00012

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas B. Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Global Hemp, Inc.

Defendants

Marco Vinicio Villatoro

Vini Villatoro

Jeremy Luciano

Industrial Hemp Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan LA Phillips

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Industrial Hemp Solutions, LLC, Jeremy Luciano, Marco Vinicio Villatoro. (Morgan, Jessica) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Industrial Hemp Solutions, LLC, Jeremy Luciano, Marco Vinicio Villatoro. (Sigler, James) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Sigler on behalf of Industrial Hemp Solutions, LLC, Jeremy Luciano, Marco Vinicio Villatoro (Sigler, James) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#8

(#8) SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint, by Global Hemp, Inc.. (Phillips, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Filing re: Patent or Trademark re #1 Complaint. (MNM) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Industrial Hemp Solutions, LLC, Jeremy Luciano, and Marco Vinicio Villatoro. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/25/2020. Granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan LA Phillips. cc: Counsel(KJA) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

4 #2

Proposed Order

4 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#4

(#4) MOTION for Jonathan LA Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $125, receipt number P33004051, filed by Plaintiff Global Hemp, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (MNM) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Global Hemp, Inc. (MNM) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

1 #3

Summons Tendered

1 #2

Cover Letter

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Industrial Hemp Solutions, LLC, Jeremy Luciano, and Marco Vinicio Villatoro. Filing fee $400, receipt number P33004051, filed by Global Hemp, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Summons Tendered) (MNM) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 3/25/2020. IT IS ORDERED:1. Counsel who will represent the parties at trial and who have full authority to enter stipulations, to make admissions, and to bind the parties with respect to dates agreed upon or ordered shall be available for a TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON APRIL 6, 2020 at 9:30 AM CENTRAL TIME. Counsel must call 1-877-848-7030 then give the Access Code 2523122 and #, then when prompted press # again to join the call.2. Pursuant to Rule 26(f) Fed.R.Civ.P. counsel shall discuss and establish a discovery plan which shall be submitted to the Court at the scheduling conference either orally during the telephonic conference or in writing. Counsel are directed to make the mandatory disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(l) Fed.R.Civ.P. by said conference date.3. At the Rule 16 telephonic scheduling conference dates will be fixed for the following, as appropriate to the case: a) Joinder of additional parties and amendments to pleadings. b) Disclosure of deadlines for experts. c) Discovery scope, limits and completion. d) Filing of dispositive motions. e) Exchange of exhibits and final witness lists. f) Conferences before trial, including a final pretrial conference. g) Trial. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (KPH) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Industrial Hemp Solutions, LLC, Jeremy Luciano, Marco Vinicio Villatoro. (Morgan, Jessica) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Industrial Hemp Solutions, LLC, Jeremy Luciano, Marco Vinicio Villatoro. (Sigler, James) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Sigler on behalf of Industrial Hemp Solutions, LLC, Jeremy Luciano, Marco Vinicio Villatoro (Sigler, James) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint, by Global Hemp, Inc.. (Phillips, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Filing re: Patent or Trademark re #1 Complaint. (MNM) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Industrial Hemp Solutions, LLC, Jeremy Luciano, and Marco Vinicio Villatoro. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/25/2020. Granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan LA Phillips. cc: Counsel(KJA) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Jonathan LA Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $125, receipt number P33004051, filed by Plaintiff Global Hemp, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (MNM) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Global Hemp, Inc. (MNM) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Industrial Hemp Solutions, LLC, Jeremy Luciano, and Marco Vinicio Villatoro. Filing fee $400, receipt number P33004051, filed by Global Hemp, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Summons Tendered) (MNM) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan LA Phillips