This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2022 at 09:16:39 (UTC).

GLESSNER v. SMITH et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 GLESSNER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SMITH. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is TILMAN E SELF, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00251

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TILMAN E SELF, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBIN GLESSNER

Defendants

JONATHAN D SMITH

STEVE C DAVIS INC

PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY

FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRADLEY J SURVANT

Po Box 26610

Macon, GA 31221-6610

W CARL REYNOLDS

Attorney at REYNOLDS, HORNE & SURVANT

Po Box 26610

Macon, GA 31221-6610

Defendant Attorneys

BRENTON W COLE

3414 Peachtree Rd Ne Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30326

JASON DAVID LEWIS

3920 Arkwright Rd, Ste 405

Macon, GA 31210

BEATRICE CAROLYN HANCOCK

Po Box 18086

Macon, GA 31209

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 2/14/2023. Dispositive motions due by 3/16/2023. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 8/19/2022. (ggs) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Dismiss Party. Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois is hereby dismissed from this action without prejudice. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 8/5/2022. (ggs) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

12 #1

Proposed Order Order Dismissing Progressive Premier Ins Co of Il Without Prejudi

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROGRESSIVE PREMIER INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS identifying Corporate Parent THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION, Corporate Parent Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc for PROGRESSIVE PREMIER INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS. (HANCOCK, BEATRICE) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROGRESSIVE PREMIER INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS identifying Corporate Parent PROGRESSIVE for PROGRESSIVE PREMIER INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS. (HANCOCK, BEATRICE) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by PROGRESSIVE PREMIER INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS with Jury Demand.(HANCOCK, BEATRICE)Attorney BEATRICE CAROLYN HANCOCK added to party PROGRESSIVE PREMIER INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS(pty:dft) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

8 #1

Required Form

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand.(COLE, BRENTON) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by STEVE C DAVIS INC with Jury Demand.(COLE, BRENTON) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC with Jury Demand.(COLE, BRENTON) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by JONATHAN D SMITH with Jury Demand.(COLE, BRENTON) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#3

(#3) Jurisdictional Statement by FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC, PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, STEVE C DAVIS INC (COLE, BRENTON) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC, PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, STEVE C DAVIS INC identifying Corporate Parent PROTECTIVE INSURANCE CORPORATION for PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY; Corporate Parent FEDEX CORPORATION for FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC. (COLE, BRENTON) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 2/14/2023. Dispositive motions due by 3/16/2023. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 8/19/2022. (ggs) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Dismiss Party. Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois is hereby dismissed from this action without prejudice. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 8/5/2022. (ggs) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Party PROGRESSIVE PREMIER INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS by ROBIN GLESSNER filed by BRADLEY J SURVANT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Dismissing Progressive Premier Ins Co of Il Without Prejudice)(SURVANT, BRADLEY) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROGRESSIVE PREMIER INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS identifying Corporate Parent THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION, Corporate Parent Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc for PROGRESSIVE PREMIER INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS. (HANCOCK, BEATRICE) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSECOND NOTICE of Deficiency (related document(s): #10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by PROGRESSIVE PREMIER INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS ); Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations (i.e "Other Affiliates") and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. These must be added within CM/ECF while the document is being filed. The subsidiary companies were not added during filing.(ggs) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by PROGRESSIVE PREMIER INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS ); Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations (i.e "Other Affiliates") and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. These must be added within CM/ECF while the document is being filed. the subsidiary companies were not added during filing.(ggs) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROGRESSIVE PREMIER INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS identifying Corporate Parent PROGRESSIVE for PROGRESSIVE PREMIER INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS. (HANCOCK, BEATRICE) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by PROGRESSIVE PREMIER INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS with Jury Demand.(HANCOCK, BEATRICE)Attorney BEATRICE CAROLYN HANCOCK added to party PROGRESSIVE PREMIER INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS(pty:dft) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 8/18/2022. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 7/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(chc) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand.(COLE, BRENTON) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by STEVE C DAVIS INC with Jury Demand.(COLE, BRENTON) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC with Jury Demand.(COLE, BRENTON) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by JONATHAN D SMITH with Jury Demand.(COLE, BRENTON) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Jurisdictional Statement by FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC, PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, STEVE C DAVIS INC (COLE, BRENTON) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC, PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, STEVE C DAVIS INC identifying Corporate Parent PROTECTIVE INSURANCE CORPORATION for PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY; Corporate Parent FEDEX CORPORATION for FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC. (COLE, BRENTON) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by STEVE C DAVIS INC, JONATHAN D SMITH, FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM INC, PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ). All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. See Local Rule 87.1.In diversity cases, a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties. Please file the required statement immediately. See Local Rule 87.2.(mdm) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4130789, $402 filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) All parties must refile pending motions from the court of origin in this new case.(COLE, BRENTON) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JASON D LEWIS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brenton Webster Cole