This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 18:21:26 (UTC).

Glen v. TripAdvisor LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 Glen filed an Other lawsuit against TripAdvisor LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01809

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert M. Glen

Defendants

TripAdvisor LLC

Trip Network, Inc.

Kayak Software Corporation

Orbitz, LLC

Booking Holdings, Inc.

TripAdvisor, Inc.

Trip Network, Inc. doing business as CheapTickets

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jessica Zeldin

Attorney at Rosenthal, Monhait & Goddess, P.A.

Mellon Bank Center, Suite 1401, P.O. Box 1070, 919 Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19899-1070

Scott Saldana

Ryan M. Goldstein

Craig A. Boneau

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

PHV Certification of Craig A. Boneau

5 #2

Certification of Ryan M. Goldstein

5 #3

Certification of Scott Saldaa

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert M. Glen. TripAdvisor LLC served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Zeldin, Jessica) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert M. Glen. TripAdvisor, Inc. served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Zeldin, Jessica) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorneys Craig A. Boneau, Ryan M. Goldstein, Scott Saldana for Robert M. Glen added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Craig A. Boneau, Ryan M. Goldstein and Scott Saldaa filed by Robert M. Glen. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/3/2019. (dlw) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Craig A. Boneau, Ryan M. Goldstein and Scott Saldaa - filed by Robert M. Glen. (Attachments: #1 PHV Certification of Craig A. Boneau, #2 Certification of Ryan M. Goldstein, #3 Certification of Scott Saldaa)(Zeldin, Jessica) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Booking Holdings, Inc. on 10/2/2019; Kayak Software Corporation on 10/2/2019; Orbitz, LLC on 10/2/2019; Trip Network, Inc. on 10/2/2019; TripAdvisor LLC on 10/2/2019; TripAdvisor, Inc. on 10/2/2019 (2 copies for each Defendant). (myr) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Actions by Robert M. Glen (Zeldin, Jessica) Modified on 10/4/2019 (dlw). (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter attaching additional filing fee of $6,548.00, receipt number DEX032439. (nmg) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (nmg) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Booking Holdings, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Orbitz, LLC, Trip Network, Inc., TripAdvisor LLC, and TripAdvisor, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2740824.) - filed by Robert M. Glen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Trip Network, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where KAYAK SOFTWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ORBITZ is a litigant

Latest cases where Priceline.com, LLC is a litigant