This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2019 at 10:17:30 (UTC).

Glaxo Group Limited et al v. Respirent Pharmaceuticals Co., Ltd.

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 Glaxo Group Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Respirent Pharmaceuticals Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise L. Cote. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02666

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise L. Cote

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Glaxo Group Limited

ViiV Healthcare Company

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Respirent Pharmaceuticals Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jyotin Hamid

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton, LLP (NYC)

919 Third Avenue, 3Rd Floor

New York, NY 10022

Zheng Wang

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

919 Third Ave.

New York, NY 10022

Jaime M. Freilich

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Thomas Patrick Lane

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Frank Samuel Restagno

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Laura Marie Franco

Attorney at Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP (CA)

1001 Page Mill Road, Building 2

Palo Alto, CA 94304

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ANSWER to #12 Counterclaim. Document filed by Glaxo Group Limited.(Hamid, Jyotin) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (Revised): On July 3, 2019, the parties informed the Court that they withdraw their jury trial demands and consent to a bench trial in the above-captioned case. Accordingly, the following revised schedule shall govern the further conduct of pretrial proceedings in this case: (1)The parties shall comply with their Rule 26(a)(1), Fed. R. Civ. P., initial disclosure obligations by July 26, 2019. (2) No additional parties may be joined or pleadings amended after August 9, 2019. (3) This case has been referred to mediation. The Clerk of Court will contact the parties when a mediator has been selected. Mediation shall take place in February or March 2020. (4) The parties shall jointly submit a draft ESI Protocol and Protective Order by August 9, 2019......(8)The Joint Pretrial Order must be filed by July 7, 2020.... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/3/2019) (gr) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Jyotin Hamid (Debevoise & Plimpton LLP) & Thomas Lane (Winston & Strawn LLP) dated July 3, 2019 re: Bench Trial. Document filed by Glaxo Group Limited, ViiV Healthcare Company.(Hamid, Jyotin) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Laura M. Franco dated June 28, 2019 re: matters raised during initial pretrial conference. Document filed by Respirent Pharmaceuticals Co., Ltd..(Franco, Laura) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/21/2019. (gr) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program to take place in February or March 2020. The parties are notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/21/2019) (gr) Transmission to Mediation Clerk for processing. (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER ("Order"): As set forth at the pretrial conference held pursuant to Rule 16, Fed. R. Civ. P., on June 21, 2019, the following schedule shall govern the further conduct of pretrial proceedings in this case......This case will be referred to mediation. The Clerk of Court will contact the parties when a mediator has been selected. Mediation shall take place in February or March 2020. The parties shall jointly submit a draft ESI Protocol and Protective Order by August 9, 2019. All fact discovery must be completed by March 20, 2020....All discovery must be completed by June 19, 2020......Any motion for summary judgment -Motion served by July 7, 2020-Opposition served by August 7, 2020-Reply served by August 21, 2020.....In the event no motion is filed, the Joint Pretrial Order must be filed by July 7, 2020....(Please read Order for rest of schedule.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/21/2019) (gr) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIMS....to and including July 10, 2019. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/21/2019) (gr) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Glaxo Group Limited, ViiV Healthcare Company. (Hamid, Jyotin) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Thomas Patrick Lane dated 6/19/2019 re: request to adjourn the 6/21/19 initial pretrial conference, or, alternatively, permission for my colleague, Laura Mr. Franco, Esq. to appear at the conference in my stead. ENDORSEMENT: Ms. Franco may attend the June 21 conference. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/19/2019) (gr) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2019
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Gregory H. Woods is no longer assigned to the case. (jc) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (dnh) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jyotin Hamid. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Hamid, Jyotin) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent GlaxoSmithKline, PLC for Glaxo Group Limited, ViiV Healthcare Company. Document filed by Glaxo Group Limited, ViiV Healthcare Company.(Hamid, Jyotin) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hamid, Jyotin) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Respirent Pharmaceuticals Co., Ltd.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16558663)Document filed by Glaxo Group Limited, ViiV Healthcare Company.(Hamid, Jyotin) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLAXO GROUP LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where ViiV Healthcare UK (No. 3) Limited is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank Samuel Restagno

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura M Franco